Campbell et al v. California Reconveyance Company et al

Plaintiff: David M Campbell and Marie G Campbell
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, U.S. Bank NA, Unknown Parties and California Reconveyance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv00180
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Defendants' 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing the Clerk to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/12.(REW)
May 22, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 47 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline, Dispositive motions due by 6/29/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/21/12.(REW)
May 2, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants shall, within 14 days of this order, produce to Plaintiffs (1) all documentation of the transfer of the note from First Magnus to Washington Mutual and subsequent transfers into and out of the Trust, and (2) all documentation of Deborah Brignac's authority to sign on behalf of MERS and U.S. Bank. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/1/12. (REW)
May 5, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court will set a Rule 16 Case Management Hearing by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/5/2011.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. California Reconveyance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M Campbell
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie G Campbell
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Michael D Curran
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Michael D Curran
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Represented By: Michael D Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?