Tavilla et al v. Cephalon Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Britny Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla and Donna Tavilla
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Cephalon Incorporated
Petitioner: Endocrinology Associates
Case Number: 2:2011cv00270
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2013 Filing 223 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing, 11/26/13). (LAD)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #221 Motion to Permit Transcript Request. The Court Reporter is permitted to prepare a transcript of the November 26, 2013 hearing for Cephalon. The transcript of the hearing shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/18/2013.(ALS)
December 16, 2013 Filing 221 MOTION To Permit Transcript Request by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Kathleen)
December 3, 2013 Filing 220 SEALED Notice of Lodging Declaration filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (LAD)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #215 Motion to Seal re #216 Sealed Lodged Notice of Lodging. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/3/13. (LAD) (cc: Plaintiffs, Defense Counsel)
December 2, 2013 Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 11/26/2013 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
November 27, 2013 Filing 216 * (Filed at Doc. #220 ) SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Filing Declaration. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Cephalon Incorporated re: #215 motion to seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add link to motion to seal on 12/2/2013 (CEI). Modified on 12/4/2013 (LAD).
November 27, 2013 Filing 215 MOTION to Seal Document by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Kathleen)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 *SEALED ORDER Appointing Guardian Ad Litem and Conservator; Approving of Minor's Settlement; Granting Guardian Ad Litem Authority; and Dismissing Lawsuit with Prejudice. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/26/13. (cc: Plas/Dfns Cnsl)(MAP) *Modified file date from 11/27 to 11/26 on 12/2/2013 (CEI).
November 26, 2013 Filing 214 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Motion Hearing on joint motion for appointment of guardian ad litem and conservator and approval of minor's settlement, and dismissing case with prejudice (doc. 213 lodged). Defendant's motion for permission to lodge under seal (doc. 212) is granted held on 11/26/2013. Court will enter an order granting appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Conservator Sandra Wingo behalf of minor Alyssa Tavilla. Court approves minor settlement, and dismisses case with prejudice. Payment to plaintiffs due 12/13/2013. Plaintiffs sign releases. Releases notarized. Court order to follow. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:08 PM to 4:52 PM. (Plas/Dfns Cnsl)(MAP)
November 12, 2013 Filing 213 *Filed at Doc. #217 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Sealed Order: (1) Appointing Guardian; (2) Approving Minor's Settlement; (3) Granting Guardian ad litem Authority; and (4) Dismissing Lawsuit with Prejudice re: #212 MOTION to Seal Document . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen) *Modified on 11/27/2013 (MAP)*.
November 12, 2013 Filing 212 MOTION to Seal Document by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Stephen)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SEALED ORDER Setting a hearing on the #210 Joint Motion for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Conservator and Approval of Minor's Settlement onNovember 26, 2013 at 4:00 p.m. before the Honorable David G. Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/13. (cc: Pros Se Plas/Dfns Cnsl) (MAP)
October 30, 2013 Filing 210 SEALED MOTION and SEALED MOTION by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MAP)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SEALED ORDER granting #207 Motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/29/13. (cc: All Cnsl)(MAP)
October 25, 2013 Filing 208 *Filed at Doc. #210 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Joint Motion for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Conservator and Approval of Minor's Settlement re: #207 motion to seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add link to motion to seal on 10/28/2013 (CEI). *Modified on 10/30/2013 (MAP)*.
October 25, 2013 Filing 207 *Joint MOTION For Permission To File Under Seal by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to seal exhibits A and B on 10/25/2013 (LAD);Modified event from Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Motion to Seal Document on 10/28/2013 (CEI).
October 24, 2013 Filing 206 REPORT of Richard T. Treon - Notice to Court re #204 , #203 , 205 by Plaintiff Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER, the Court enters the following orders with respect to Attorney Treon; by 10/25/13, Mr. Treon shall file a notice in this case stating whether he possesses or intends to assert any claim or lien against Defendant Cephalon; by 10/25/13, Mr. Treon shall provide Plaintiffs with a full and complete paper copy of their file in this case (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/16/13. (REW)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER, by 10/25/13, the parties jointly shall file a motion for appointment of a conservator and approval of the settlement with respect to the minor Plaintiff in this case; the Court will set another hearing after reviewing the motion; the Court will issue an Order to attorney Richard Treon regarding Defendant Cephalon; by 10/25/13, Plaintiffs shall either sign the settlement documents prepared by Defendant Cephalon or state that they are unwilling to sign such documents; by the procedure as stated in this order, the Court intends to finalize settlement in this case, after which the claims against Cephalon will be dismissed with prejudice (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/16/13. (REW)
October 15, 2013 Filing 205 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference re: Settlement held on 10/15/2013. Discussion held. Court will enter two separate orders as it relates to settlement. APPEARANCES: Nicolai and Donna Tavilla for Pro Se Plaintiffs. John Brenner - Telephonic and Kathleen Kahn for Defendant (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:29 PM to 4:49 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Mr. Brenner may appear telephonically at the hearing set for October 15, 2013 at 4:30 p.m. Mr. Brenner shall call the following number: (602) 322-7645. Local counsel for Defendant and all plaintiffs shall appear in person at the hearing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/8/13.(SJF)
October 8, 2013 Filing 201 MOTION for Permission to Appear Telephonically at October 15 Status Conference by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Stephen)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER, Status Conference set for 10/15/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell; all Plaintiffs shall appear in person at the hearing; Counsel for Defendants shall appear in person at the hearing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/7/13. (REW)
September 27, 2013 Filing 199 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #198 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (REW)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall show cause, by 9/27/13, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court orders; Plaintiffs are warned that this case will be dismissed without further notice if they fail to respond by that date. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/12/13. (REW)
September 12, 2013 Filing 197 STATUS REPORT by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
September 9, 2013 Filing 196 *NOTICE of Change of Firm Name Change and E-Mail Address by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen) *Modified from Notice on 9/10/2013* (REW).
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Attorney Richard Treon has sent a letter to the Court concerning issues with Plaintiffs in this matter. The letter appears to be an improper ex parte communication and will be disregarded by the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/26/2013. (TCA)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER, the Tavillas have sent a letter to the Court concerning issues with their former counsel. As it does not appear that a copy of the letter was sent to defense counsel, the letter appears to be an improper ex parte communication and will be disregarded by the Court. The Tavillas shall file a response to the status report filed by Defendants #193 , including stating their position on the settlement on or before 8/6/13. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/23/13. (REW)
July 19, 2013 Filing 193 STATUS REPORT by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
July 11, 2013 Filing 192 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 6/28/2013, before Judge Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2013. (VPB)
July 3, 2013 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 6/28/2013 before Judge Campbell.. (Kahn, Kathleen)
June 28, 2013 Filing 190 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference held on 6/28/2013. Parties reached a settlement before Judge Bade. Defendant identifies a number of conditions to be met before settlement is finalized. Plaintiffs need to sign settlement agreement and release papers,stipulate to dismissal of lawsuit with prejudice,provide social security number of minor daughter A.T.,determination on how much to allocate to minor and whether any fees and costs get deducted from amount and then Court approval, and plaintiffs needs to provide assurances to defendant that steps are being taken to discharge the liens. Discussion held. Court -Plaintiffs to provide the social security number of minor daughter. Plaintiffs by the end of next week provide a signed copy of the settlement agreement or feedback. If parties are unable to resolve any issues go back to Judge Bade to work them out. Stipulation of dismissal wait until there is a written agreement and until parties know a settlement is deemed adequate for the minor. Discharge of Liens to be resolved between the parties and attorney Treon. Parties to provide a status report 21 days after today. APPEARANCES: Nicolai Tavilla and Donna Tavilla Pro Se Plaintiffs. John Brenner (Telephonic), Stephen Bressler, Kathleen Kahn for Defendant (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:42 PM to 4:59 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
June 19, 2013 Filing 189 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade: Settlement Conference held on 6/19/2013. Settlement Reached. APPEARANCES: Pro Se Plaintiffs Nicola Tavilla and Donna Tavilla. Attorneys John F. Brenner and Stephen M. Bressler for Defendant. Howard Cyr for defendant Cephalon. Hearing held 9:30 AM to 6:30 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (PKD)
May 20, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 5/9/2013, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013. (VAR)
May 14, 2013 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 5/9/2013 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 6/19/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade (see order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 5/10/13. (REW)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER, Mr Treon shall provide the Tavillas with a full and complete copy of their file in this case no later than 5/24/13. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/9/13. (REW)
May 9, 2013 Filing 185 AMENDED Minute Entry: Amending Doc. #184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference held on 5/9/2013. ORDERED denying #180 Motion to Seal; Status Conference set for 6/28/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (see minute entry for details) (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 4:25 PM to 4:52 PM. Reason for Amendment: to reflect correct time of status hearing on 6/28/2013.(TCA)
May 9, 2013 Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference held on 5/9/2013. ORDERED denying #180 Motion to Seal; Status Conference set for 6/28/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (see minute entry for details) (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 4:25 PM to 4:52 PM.(TCA)
May 8, 2013 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #180 MOTION to Seal MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL NOTICE TO COURT OF INFORMATION... AND FOR ADVICE REGARDING SERVICE filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
May 8, 2013 Filing 181 SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice to Court of Information Regarding Mr. Tavilla's Health re: #180 MOTION to Seal MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL NOTICE TO COURT OF INFORMATION... AND FOR ADVICE REGARDING SERVICE. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
May 7, 2013 Filing 180 *MOTION to Seal MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL NOTICE TO COURT OF INFORMATION... AND FOR ADVICE REGARDING SERVICE by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treon, Richard) *Modified to note attorney noticed to lodge related document on 5/8/2013 (JHER).
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Status Conference reset for 5/9/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/2/2013. (TCA)
March 12, 2013 Filing 178 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 3/1/2013, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/2/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2013. (VAR)
March 6, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 2/27/2013, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2013. (VAR)
March 5, 2013 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 3/1/2013 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
March 1, 2013 Filing 175 *Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Motion Hearing held on 3/1/2013. Granting #169 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard T Treon terminated. Plaintiffs will have 60 days to obtain new counsel. Status Conference set for 5/10/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/13 is vacated. Bench Trial set for 3/19/13 is vacated. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:33PM to 3:53 PM.(REW) *Modified to correct file date from (3/4/2013) to (3/1/2013) and correct future hearing time; NEF regenerated on 3/5/2013 (CMAL).
February 27, 2013 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 2/27/2013 before Judge Campbell. (Bressler, Stephen)
February 27, 2013 Filing 173 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2013. Re: #169 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Emergency Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by Nicolai Tavilla, Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla. Plaintiffs are not present. APPEARANCES: Richard Treon for Plaintiffs. Stephen Bressler, Kathleen Kahn, John Brenner (telephonic) for Defendant Motion Hearing re: Motion to withdraw counsel is reset for 3/1/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for plaintiffs is advised to notify his clients of the requirement that all plaintiffs attend the hearing now scheduled for 3/1/2013 at 3:30 p.m. Court will address the filing of a pretrial order and findings of fact at the hearing on Friday. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 2:02 PM to 2:15 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion for telephonic appearance by out of state counsel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/26/2013.(NVO)
February 26, 2013 Filing 171 MOTION Telephonic Appearance by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Kathleen)
February 25, 2013 Filing 170 Hearing set as to #169 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Emergency Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record: Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for all parties shall appear in person at the hearing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/25/2013. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
February 25, 2013 Filing 169 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Emergency Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Treon, Richard)
February 13, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE re Service by Cephalon Incorporated . (Kahn, Kathleen)
February 8, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T. and A.T., filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
February 6, 2013 Filing 166 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T. and A.T, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 31, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T. and A.T., filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 30, 2013 Filing 164 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, KT, AT, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 30, 2013 Filing 163 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T., A.T., filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 Filing 162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 1/25/2013. Defendant request permission to file a motion to strike 3 expert reports submitted by plaintiff on 1/11/2013. Discussion held. Court at the bench trial scheduled for March will identify the expert reports disclosed by plaintiff and that plaintiff will rely and defendants expert reports disclosed and what defendant will reply. The only rebuttal allowed by plaintiff is in direct response to defendant expert reports. Depositions of the minor children and Britny Tavilla discussed. Court will allow depositions on 1/31/13. If the parties in agreement to go beyond that deadline and agree upon a date, Court has no objection. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Richard Treon for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by John Brenner, Stephen Bressler, and Kathleen Kahn for Defendant (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 10:03 AM to 10:15 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
January 25, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T., a minor, and A.T., a minor, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER. Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 1/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/17/2013. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
January 16, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T., a minor, A.T., a minor, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 14, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference Proceedings held on 12/6/2012, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2013. (VAR)
January 11, 2013 Filing 157 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Disclosure Statement Regarding Rebuttal Expert Opinions by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla . (Treon, Richard)
January 8, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T., a minor and A.T. a minor, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 7, 2013 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla for proceedings held on 12/6/12 before Judge Campbell.. (Treon, Richard)
January 4, 2013 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 12/06/2012 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
December 17, 2012 Filing 153 NOTICE re Service (supplemental disclosure) by Cephalon Incorporated . (Kahn, Kathleen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 152 NOTICE re Service (Expert Disclosure) by Cephalon Incorporated . (Bressler, Stephen)
December 6, 2012 Filing 151 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 12/6/2012. Counsel for the defendant notified by plaintiff counsel by phone that the 3 daughters of plaintiff will be unable to attend the scheduled depositions on 12/7/2012. Discussion held. Court will extend the depositions of Britny Tavilla and the 2 minor daughters until 1/31/2013. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Richard Treon for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Stephen Bressler for Defendant. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
November 13, 2012 Filing 150 NOTICE of Deposition of Britny Tavilla, K.T. (minor), A.T. (minor), filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
November 13, 2012 Filing 149 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference Proceedings held on 11/1/2012, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2013. (VAR)
November 12, 2012 Filing 148 NOTICE re Service by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla . (Treon, Richard)
November 7, 2012 Filing 147 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference Proceedings held on 9/19/2012, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2013. (VAR)
November 6, 2012 Filing 146 NOTICE re Independent Medical Examination by Cephalon Incorporated . (Bressler, Stephen)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/2/2012. (NVO)
November 2, 2012 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla for proceedings held on 11/1/12 before Judge Campbell.. (Treon, Richard)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re #133 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Expert Proofs for Failure to Comply with the Second Case Management Order filed by Cephalon Incorporated. Bench Trial re statute of limitations set for 3/19/2013-3/21/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/2/2012. (NVO) Modified on 11/5/2012 to correct year of trial date(SJF).
November 2, 2012 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 11/1/2012 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 Filing 141 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 11/1/2012. Following issues discussed: Status of representation of plaintiffs by counsel Richard Treon;Plaintiff failure to disclose expert reports by 10/5/2012;Psychiatiric exam of Nicolai Tavilla; Statue of limitations and scheduling of trial. Court will take the matters discussed today under advisement and issue an order. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Richard Treon for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by John Brenner and Stephen Bressler for Defendant. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
October 31, 2012 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla for proceedings held on 09/19/2012 before Judge Campbell.. (Treon, Richard)
October 31, 2012 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 09/19/2012 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
October 31, 2012 Filing 138 NOTICE re Service by Cephalon Incorporated . (Bressler, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER. Discovery Conference set for 11/1/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Defendant shall initiate the conference call with all parties and the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/30/2012. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying #132 Motion for Hearing. This motion concerns, in part, alleged lack of compliance with discovery schedules. As noted in the previous text-only order, counsel should place a conference call to the Court to resolve these matters rather than filing motions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10-24-12. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying #131 Motion to Compel. The motion presents a discovery dispute. The Court's Case Management Order prohibits the filing of discovery motions. See Doc. 13. Counsel should place a telephone conference to the Court to resolve this discovery issue. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10-24-12. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
October 19, 2012 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM re Trial on Statute of Limitations by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
October 17, 2012 Filing 133 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Expert Proofs for Failure to Comply with the Second Case Management Order by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 Filing 132 *MOTION for Hearing re: Rule 16 Conference by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen) *Modified from Request on 10/15/2012* (REW).
October 11, 2012 Filing 131 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Mr. Tavilla to Submit to Independent Psychiatric Examination by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER, granting Defendants' #117 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel; disqualification is granted with respect to a jury trial on the merits and a jury trial on the statute of limitations defense; Mr Treon is not disqualified for purposes of pretrial litigation or a trial to the Court on the statute of limitations defense; Plaintiffs' counsel shall, on or before 10/12/12, notify defense counsel as to whether all Plaintiffs will waive a jury trial on the statute of limitations defense; if they will, the limitations defense will be tried to the Court; if they will not, the defense will be tried to a jury; on or before 10/19/12, the parties shall file with the Court a memorandum stating whether the statute of limitations trial will be to the Court or a jury, and setting forth their view on when the trial should occur and how long it will take. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/12. (REW)
September 19, 2012 Filing 129 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2012. Discussion re: Substantial hardship under ER 3.7 and bifurcated trial on statue of limitations. ORDEREDtaking under advisement #117 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Court will issue an order APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Richard Treon for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by John Brenner and Stephen Bressler for Defendant. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER. During tomorrow's telephone hearing, the parties should be prepared to address whether granting of the motion to disqualify plaintiffs' counsel would create substantial hardship for plaintiffs within the meaning of ER 3.7, and, if so, what course of action the Court should follow. The parties should also be prepared to address the possibility of a bifurcated trial on the statute of limitations defense, how it would be tried, and why it is or is not a good idea. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9-19-12. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re #117 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Cephalon Incorporated. TELEPHONIC HEARING set as to #117 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants shall coordinate a conference call with the Court for purposes of holding the telephonic hearing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/18/2012. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. The Court has received the parties' request that the Court appoint Magistrate Judge Duncan to coduct settlement talks. While the Court appreciates the parties' confidence in Judge Duncan, the Court's policy is to appoint settlement judges only through the Court's draw, and not upon selection of the parties. In light of this policy, the Court understands that the parties prefer to retain a private mediator. If this is incorrect, the parties should call the Court's chambers and request designation of a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9-5-12. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
August 31, 2012 Filing 125 REPORT of Joint Report Regarding Settlement Talks by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
August 22, 2012 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
August 15, 2012 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #117 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CEPHALON'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Treon, Richard)
August 9, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference Proceedings held on 7/11/2012, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2012. (VAR)
August 6, 2012 Filing 121 NOTICE re Intent to Issue Subpoena by Cephalon Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Kahn, Kathleen)
August 6, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE of Deposition of Ira Ungar, MD, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 6, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Nava, MD, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 6, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen H. Poulos, DDS, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
July 20, 2012 Filing 117 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
July 13, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Nava, MD, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
July 13, 2012 Filing 115 NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen Poulos, DDS, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
July 13, 2012 Filing 114 NOTICE of Deposition of Ira Ungar, MD, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
July 12, 2012 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla for proceedings held on 7/11/12 before Judge Campbell.. (Treon, Richard)
July 11, 2012 Filing 112 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Defendant Cephalon's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla . (Treon, Richard)
July 11, 2012 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 07/11/2012 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
July 11, 2012 Filing 110 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephonic Appearances: Richard Treon for plaintiffs;John Brenner and Stephen Bressler for defendantsTelephone Conference held on 7/11/2012. Hearing held to discuss defendant's intentions to file a motion to disqualify plaintiff's counsel. Parties arguments to the Court. Defendant to file their motion to disqualify plaintiff's counsel by 7/20/12 addressing what happens when a lawyer is going to be a witness at trial and why you believe the Court should disqualify plaintiff's counsel Mr. Treon. Plaintiff response due 8/15/2012. Plaintiff to indicate in the response whether counsel will be a witness at trial. Defendant reply due 8/22/2012. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. Telephone Conference set for 7/11/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Defendants have requested the hearing for purposes of setting a schedule for a disqualificatiaon motion. Counsel for Defendants shall initiate a conference call to include counsel for all parties and the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/5/2012. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
July 2, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 5/25/2012, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2012. (VAR)
June 21, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Disclosure Statement by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla . (Treon, Richard)
June 15, 2012 Filing 106 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Cephalon Incorporated . (Kahn, Kathleen)
June 4, 2012 Filing 105 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Cephalon Incorporated Service of Discovery. (Kahn, Kathleen)
May 31, 2012 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla for proceedings held on 05/25/2012 before Judge Campbell.. (Treon, Richard)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Second Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/14/2012. Dispositive motions due by 4/19/2013.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/31/2012. (see order for details)(TCA)
May 31, 2012 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 05/25/2012 before Judge Campbell.. (Kahn, Kathleen)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #96 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/30/2012.(NVO)
May 25, 2012 Filing 100 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Appearances: Richard Treon for plaintiffs; John Brenner and Stephen Bressler for defendantsSecond Scheduling Conference held on 5/25/2012. Discussion held. The motion for reconsideration will be granted as to defendant Britny Tavilla. Court will issue an order. Deadlines discussed. Second scheduling order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
May 24, 2012 Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION for Reconsideration REGARDING GRANTING OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT CLAIMS filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
May 21, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE re Joint Proposed Schedule for the Remainder of the Litigation by Cephalon Incorporated . (Bressler, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re #96 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING GRANTING OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT CLAIMS filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration no later than 4:00 PM on 5/24/2012. The Court will not grant extensions to this deadline. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/21/2012. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
May 17, 2012 Filing 96 MOTION for Reconsideration REGARDING GRANTING OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT CLAIMS by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Treon, Richard)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. The Court has set a SECOND Rule 16 Case Management Conference for 5/25/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. The parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for the remainder of the litigation on or before 5/21/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/7/2012. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #75 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #84 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot #84 Motion for Leave to File; denying #85 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court will set a second case management conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/3/2012.(NVO)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granted with respect to Dr. Grubb and denied with respect to Dr. Sucher #42 Motion to exclude opinions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/10/2012.(NVO)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER pursuant to #89 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint by Monday, April 2, 2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/12. (LAD)
April 4, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE of Errata re #88 Reply to Response to Motion, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATA IN REGARD TO PLAINTIFFS' REPLY (Doc. 88) TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE)... by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
April 2, 2012 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re #85 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ALLEGING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR FRAUD filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Counsel's Declaration)(Treon, Richard)
March 29, 2012 Filing 89 STIPULATION re #87 Response to Motion, Extend Time For Plaintiff To Reply by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Stipulation To Extend Time for Plaintiffs To File Their Reply To Defendants Response to Motion To Amend Complaint)(Treon, Richard)
March 23, 2012 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 MOTION to Strike #82 Statement Defendant Cephalon's Statement of Additional Facts in Support of Reply Brief; Alternatively, Plaintiffs' Request Leave to File Their Controverting Statement of Facts to Cephalon's Statement of Additional Facts filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
March 19, 2012 Filing 87 RESPONSE to Motion re #85 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ALLEGING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR FRAUD filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kahn, Kathleen)
March 13, 2012 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #84 MOTION to Strike #82 Statement Defendant Cephalon's Statement of Additional Facts in Support of Reply Brief; Alternatively, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Their Controverting Statement of Facts to Cephalon's Statement of Additional Facts in Support of Reply Brief filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
March 1, 2012 Filing 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ALLEGING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR FRAUD by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit (proposed) First Amended Complaint)(Treon, Richard)
February 27, 2012 Filing 84 * MOTION to Strike #82 Statement Defendant Cephalon's Statement of Additional Facts in Support of Reply Brief; Alternatively, Plaintiffs' MOTION for Leave to File Their Controverting Statement of Facts to Cephalon's Statement of Additional Facts in Support of Reply Brief by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard). *Modified to add motion type on 2/28/2012 (ESL).
February 6, 2012 Filing 83 OBJECTION re #80 Statement,, and Responses by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
February 6, 2012 Filing 82 STATEMENT of Additional Facts in Support of Reply Brief re #81 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
February 6, 2012 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
January 18, 2012 Filing 80 STATEMENT of PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF FACTS ESTABLISHING A GENUINE ISSUE OF MATERIAL FACT OR OTHERWISE PRECLUDING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE MOVING PARTY [PSOFE] re #78 Response to Motion,, Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #79 Statement, by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-B, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS C-D, #3 Exhibit EXHIBITS E-M, #4 Exhibit EXHIBITS N-O, #5 Exhibit EXHIBITS P-T, #6 Exhibit EXHIBITS U-W, #7 Exhibit EXHIBITS AA-FF)(Treon, Richard)
January 18, 2012 Filing 79 STATEMENT of PLAINTIFFS' CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS TO DEFENDANT CEPHALON'S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LRCiv 56.1(a) re #76 Statement, #77 Statement by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-J, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS K-S)(Treon, Richard)
January 18, 2012 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE to Motion re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CEPHALON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
January 3, 2012 Filing 77 STATEMENT of Facts, Supplemental re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #76 Statement, by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
December 16, 2011 Filing 76 STATEMENT of Facts re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Bressler, Stephen)
December 16, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
December 9, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE re Service of Discovery Responses by Cephalon Incorporated re #69 Notice (Other) . (Kahn, Kathleen)
December 7, 2011 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
December 2, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Hirsch, filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
November 23, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 11/03/2011, before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2012. (BAS)
November 15, 2011 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST AMENDED by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 11/3/11 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
November 14, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE re NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla . (Treon, Richard)
November 11, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE re Service of supplemental disclosure by Cephalon Incorporated . (Bressler, Stephen)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re status conference (discovery issues) and denying without prejudice #40 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #54 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/2011.(NVO)
November 4, 2011 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla for proceedings held on 11/3/2011 before Judge Campbell.. (Treon, Richard)
November 4, 2011 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 11/03/2011 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
November 3, 2011 Filing 67 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Richard Treon for plaintiffs, Stephen Bressler and Kathleen Kahn for defendants. Status Conference held on 11/3/2011. Separate scheduling order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
November 3, 2011 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DEFER HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 56(d), FED,R,CIV.PRO. TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO TAKE DISCOVERY OR FOR THE COURT TO ISSUE ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE ORDER filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4 to Plaintiffs' Reply, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel)(Treon, Richard)
October 27, 2011 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D. filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
October 25, 2011 Filing 61 ERRATA re #56 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment,, (Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Hearing), by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Bressler, Stephen)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. Status Conference set for 11/3/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/2011. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Plaintiff shall file their controverting statement of facts in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on 10/18/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/2011.(NVO)
October 25, 2011 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla for proceedings held on 4/1/2011 before Judge Campbell.. (Treon, Richard)
October 24, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 04/01/2011, before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2012. (BAS)
October 24, 2011 Filing 56 *RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DEFER HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 56(d), FED,R,CIV.PRO. TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO TAKE DISCOVERY OR FOR THE COURT TO ISSUE ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE ORDER Defendant Cephalon's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen) *Incorrect event selected, incorrect document number; entry modified on 10/25/2011 (SAT).
October 18, 2011 Filing 55 *STATEMENT of PLAINTIFFS' CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS TO DEFENDANT CEPHALON'S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LRC iv 56.1(a) re #41 Statement, by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H, #2 Exhibit Exhibits I-R)(Treon, Richard) *Modified document numbers on 10/20/2011 (SAT).
October 18, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DEFER HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 56(d), FED,R,CIV.PRO. TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO TAKE DISCOVERY OR FOR THE COURT TO ISSUE ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE ORDER by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declarations, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Treon, Richard)
October 18, 2011 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Controverting Statement of Facts and Exhibits in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Request for A One Day Extension to File Plaintiffs' Controverting Statement of Facts and Exhibits in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treon, Richard)
October 18, 2011 Filing 52 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts Establishing A Genuine Issue of Material Fact or Otherwise Precluding Judgment in Favor of the Moving Party re #50 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts Establishing a Genuine Issue of Material Fact or Otherwise Precluding Judgment in Favor of the Moving Party by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-F)(Treon, Richard)
October 17, 2011 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D. filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV of Michel Sucher, M.D.)(Treon, Richard)
October 17, 2011 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Cephalon's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
October 17, 2011 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cephalon Incorporated for proceedings held on 4/1/2011 before Judge Campbell.. (Bressler, Stephen)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #42 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/2011.(NVO)
October 4, 2011 Filing 47 *NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SETTLMENT OF CALIFORNIA CASE (in which Richard Treon was in trial) and MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responses, re: #42 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, MD and Christine Grubb PhD by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla re #46 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treon, Richard) *Modified to include Motion event on 10/5/2011* (REW).
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #42 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/4/2011.(NVO)
September 26, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Statement, #42 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D., #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #44 Order on Stipulation, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE THE DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THEIR RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF MICHEL SUCHER, M.D. AND CHRISTINE GRUBB, Ph.D. by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Treon, Richard)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER pursuant to #43 Stipulation: Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to #42 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D. Plaintiffs shall file response on or before 9/30/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/19/2011. (NVO)
September 15, 2011 Filing 43 STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TIME FOR FILING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF MICHEL SUCHER, M.D. AND CHRISTINE GRUBB, PH.D. by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treon, Richard) Modified on 9/16/2011; to remove excess text (REW).
September 2, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michel Sucher, M.D. and Christine Grubb, Ph.D. by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
September 2, 2011 Filing 41 STATEMENT of Facts re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
September 2, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER finding as moot #37 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/24/2011. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
August 22, 2011 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 19, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Endocrinology Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2)(King, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 14, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE re NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' RULE 26 DISCLOSOURE STATEMENT RE: REBUTTAL OPINIONS OF MICHEL SUCHER, M.D. RE COMPETENCY by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
August 11, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE re of Intent to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Kahn, Kathleen)
August 9, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Deposition of Paul Berkowitz, MD, FAPM, filed by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
August 8, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE re of Intent to Issue Subpoenas by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum to medical providers, #2 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum to Damron, #3 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum to King)(Kahn, Kathleen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Deposition of Donna Tavilla, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deposition of Nicolai Tavilla, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deposition of Richard Treon, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deposition of Nicolai Tavilla, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Deposition of Donna Tavilla, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Michel Sucher, filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deposition of Christine Grubb, Ph.D., filed by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
July 21, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE re of Intent to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Subpoena Duces Tecum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Kahn, Kathleen)
July 15, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE re of Service by Cephalon Incorporated of Disclosure of Expert Report on Plaintiff's Competency. (Kahn, Kathleen)
July 1, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE re Intent to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum on James Arthur Eves, Esq. by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum, #2 Exhibit Ex A)(Kahn, Kathleen)
June 17, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE re NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' RULE 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT RE: COMPETENCY by Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
May 18, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE re Service of Defendant Cephalon's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
May 17, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE re Intent to Issue Subpoena Upon Medical Providers by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Kahn, Kathleen)
May 6, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE re Intent to Issue Subpoena Upon Coyote Chiropractic by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Kahn, Kathleen)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re discovery conference call. Discovery re statute of limiataions due by 8/19/2011. Dispositive motions (on statute of limitations issues) due by 9/2/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/6/2011. (NVO)
April 27, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE re Intent to Issue Subpoena Upon Medical Providers by Cephalon Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Kahn, Kathleen)
April 25, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE re Service of Discovery by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
April 21, 2011 Filing 14 STATEMENT of PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S FURTHER ADVICE TO THE COURT REGARDING FILING AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS by Plaintiffs Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Discovery related to statute of limitations due by 5/20/2011. Motion for summary judgment re statute of limitations due by 6/3/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/8/2011. (NVO)
April 1, 2011 Filing 12 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Richard Treon for plaintiffs, John Brenner, Stephen Bressler and Kathleen Kahn for defendants. At the time set for Scheduling Conference on 4/1/2011, matters are discussed. Briefing schedule entered. Scheduling Conference to be reset if necessary. Separate order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
March 25, 2011 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cephalon Incorporated, Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla, Nicolai Tavilla. (Treon, Richard)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 7, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX107207 as to John F Brenner. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 4, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John F Brenner on behalf of Cephalon Incorporated. (BAS)
February 16, 2011 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cephalon Incorporated. Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Kahn, Kathleen)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/15/2011. (NVO)
February 15, 2011 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cephalon Incorporated.(Kahn, Kathleen)
February 10, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cephalon Incorporated. (Kahn, Kathleen)
February 9, 2011 Filing 4 Miscellaneous Document: Removal Letter from USDC, District of Arizona. (REK)
February 9, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Cephalon Incorporated. (REK)
February 9, 2011 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-4877416. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-00270-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
February 9, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2010-027117 Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-4877416, filed by Cephalon Incorporated (submitted by Kathleen Kahn). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(REK)
February 9, 2011 *****State Court record received on 2/09/2011*****SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicolai Tavilla, Britny Tavilla, Donna Tavilla. Cephalon Incorporated served on 1/11/2011.*****docketed in U.S. District Court on 2/09/2011 for case management purposes.***** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavilla et al v. Cephalon Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Endocrinology Associates
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britny Tavilla
Represented By: Richard T Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolai Tavilla
Represented By: Richard T Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Tavilla
Represented By: Richard T Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn
Represented By: John F Brenner
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?