L v. Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation Health Plan et al

Plaintiff: E L
Defendant: Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation and Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation Health Plan
Case Number: 2:2011cv00271
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Robert E Jones
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike is granted in part and denied in part as stated in this opinion. Defendants are granted leave to file an amended answer within 20 days. Signed by Judge Robert E Jones on 12/06/11.(ESL)
November 8, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Defendants' 32 Motion to Strike is denied. The parties have until 01/31/12 to conduct discovery on the class allegations. Signed by Judge Robert E Jones on 11/08/11.(ESL)
August 9, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her complaint within 20 days, consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge Robert E Jones on 08/09/11.(ESL)
May 6, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert E Jones on 5/6/11. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L v. Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Barry D Halpern
Represented By: Jefferson Richard Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation Health Plan
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Barry D Halpern
Represented By: Jefferson Richard Hayden
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Barry D Halpern
Represented By: Jefferson Richard Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E L
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?