Cellco Partnership v. Hope et al

Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership
Defendant: Jason Hope, Wayne P DeStefano, Christa Stephens, Quinn McCullough, Steve Uhrman, Janet O'Meara, Cylon LLC, Eye Level Holdings LLC, New Economic Order LLC, Saguaro Media LLC, New EIN LLC, Ink Sign Holdings LLC, Yellow Ball Holdings LLC, Message Plan LLC, FYISMS.COM LLC, MYTXTSMS.COM LLC, Standard Plan LLC, Standard Message LLC, SMS City LLC, Hot-Hot-News.Com LLC, City-O-Games.Com LLC, WorldTxts.Com LLC, TopicText.Com LLC, Text Charge LLC, All-Game-Cheats.Org LLC and News Alerts LLC
Counter_claimant: Standard Plan LLC, Standard Message LLC, SMS City LLC, City-O-Games.Com LLC, Hot-Hot-News.Com LLC, WorldTxts.Com LLC, TopicText.Com LLC, All-Game-Cheats.Org LLC, News Alerts LLC, Christa Stephens, Quinn McCullough, Janet O'Meara, Wayne P DeStefano, Steve Uhrman, Jason Hope, Cylon LLC, Text Charge LLC, Eye Level Holdings LLC, New Economic Order LLC, Saguaro Media LLC, New EIN LLC, Ink Sign Holdings LLC, Yellow Ball Holdings LLC, Message Plan LLC, FYISMS.COM LLC and MYTXTSMS.COM LLC
Counter_defendant: Cellco Partnership
Case Number: 2:2011cv00432
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 284 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/2012.(NVO)
February 22, 2012 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re discovery matrixes. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/22/2012. (NVO)
January 30, 2012 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 211 Motion for Accounting and Release of Funds; granting in part and denying in part 232 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 235 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/30/2012.(NVO)
September 29, 2011 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 185 Defendant's Motion to Mandate Verizon's CEO to Appear at Settlement Conference. FURTHER ORDERED that all counsel and any party, if unrepresented, in this or other cases in the District Court of Arizona shall hereinaft er comply with the Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. The District's Rules of Practice may be found on the District Court's internet web page at ww.azd.uscourts.gov/. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/29/11.(SJF)
September 23, 2011 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Defendants' 180 Motion to Modify Settlement Conference Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/23/11.(REW)
July 26, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part/denying in part 77 Motion to Dismiss FURTHER ORDERED granting 115 Motion to Seal. Exhibit A to Defendants' reply in support of Defendants' motion to strike shall be filed by Defendants under seal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/26/11. (cc: All Cnsl) (MAP)
May 11, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion for Protective Order; denying 90 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 94 Motion to Strike ; denying 129 Motion to Strike ; denying 53 Motion to Strike ; denying 62 Motion to Strike ; denying 74 Motion to Co mpel; denying 11 Motion to Expedite. The Court will set a Rule 16 Case Management Conference by separate order. This injunction will take effect upon Verizon's posting a $25,000 bond and will remain in effect until the conclusion of trial or until further order of this Court. This bond is in addition to the $10,000 bond posted by Verizon for its TRO. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/11/2011.(NVO)
March 30, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that because the Court cannot conclude that the good cause showing for a Rule 26(c) protective order has been made by Mr. Alpert, the Court will deny his request that the deposition be prohibited or limited. Counsel for the parties in this case shall promptly provide a copy of this order to counsel for Mr. Alpert. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 03/30/11. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellco Partnership v. Hope et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Standard Plan LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Standard Message LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: SMS City LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: City-O-Games.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Hot-Hot-News.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: WorldTxts.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TopicText.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: All-Game-Cheats.Org LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: News Alerts LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Christa Stephens
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Quinn McCullough
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Janet O'Meara
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Wayne P DeStefano
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Steve Uhrman
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jason Hope
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cylon LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Text Charge LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Eye Level Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: New Economic Order LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Saguaro Media LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: New EIN LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ink Sign Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Yellow Ball Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Message Plan LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: FYISMS.COM LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MYTXTSMS.COM LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Scott B Cosgrove
Represented By: Marcos D Jimenez
Represented By: Sandra J Millor
Represented By: Ann M St Peter-Griffith
Represented By: Lindsi Michelle Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Lindsi Michelle Weber
Represented By: Ann M St Peter-Griffith
Represented By: Sandra J Millor
Represented By: Marcos D Jimenez
Represented By: Scott B Cosgrove
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hope
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne P DeStefano
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christa Stephens
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn McCullough
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Uhrman
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet O'Meara
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cylon LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eye Level Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Economic Order LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saguaro Media LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New EIN LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ink Sign Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Ball Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Message Plan LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FYISMS.COM LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYTXTSMS.COM LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Plan LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Message LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS City LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot-Hot-News.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City-O-Games.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WorldTxts.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TopicText.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Text Charge LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-Game-Cheats.Org LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Alerts LLC
Represented By: Charles Babcock
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Represented By: John Kiley Edwards
Represented By: Stephen R Fogle
Represented By: Richard E Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen M LaValle
Represented By: Curt M Langley
Represented By: Scott R McLaughlin
Represented By: Kurt Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?