Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Artesa Holdings LLC et al

Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Kayvan Sanaiha, Judy Sanaiha, Kambiz Zomorrodi, Sima Khorshipian, Unknown Parties and Artesa Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00499
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 plaintiff's request for judicial notice. Granting 60 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Summary judgment is granted to plaintiff in the amount of $12,135,538.30, plus interest at the daily rate of $3,608.32 from December 21, 2010 to the present. The Clerk shall enter judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/11/12.(DMT)
January 6, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's application for determination of fair market value and request for status/scheduling conference (doc. 45). The determination of whether a fair market value hearing should be scheduled will occur after summary judgment practice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 50 defendant's second request for status and scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/6/12.(LSP)
July 7, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice. The individual defendants are hereby dismissed from this action. The claims against defendant Artesa Holdings, LLC remain. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/7/11.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Artesa Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayvan Sanaiha
Represented By: Gregorio Miguel Garcia
Represented By: John J Hebert
Represented By: Mark W Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Sanaiha
Represented By: Gregorio Miguel Garcia
Represented By: John J Hebert
Represented By: Mark W Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kambiz Zomorrodi
Represented By: Michael R Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sima Khorshipian
Represented By: Michael R Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artesa Holdings LLC
Represented By: John J Hebert
Represented By: Gregorio Miguel Garcia
Represented By: Mark W Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Dennis M Young
Represented By: William K Swank
Represented By: Brian M Mueller
Represented By: Patrick J Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?