Young v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Carla G Young
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2011cv00538
Filed: March 23, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Attorney's Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Counsel is awarded $20,518.25 pursuant to 406(b) fees and is to refund the Plaintiff the previously awarded EAJA fees, in the sum of $7,024.95. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/14/2014. (LFIG)
January 13, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Attorne's Fees. Counsel is awarded $20,518.25 less the $7,024.95 previously awarded under the EAJA resulting in a net award of $13,493.30. See order for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/13/2014.(LMR)
November 6, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 31 Application for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $7,024.95. This payment shall be made payable to Plaintiff and shall be paid by the Agency. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/5/2012.(LFIG)
June 13, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that this matter is hereby REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/13/12. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla G Young
Represented By: Eric Glenn Slepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?