Wilson v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Michael Wilson
Defendant: GMAC Home Services LLC, Homecomings Financial LLC, BankUnited Financial Corporation, Unknown Parties and GMAC Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00546
Filed: March 23, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 79 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk shall enter judgment awarding defendants $68,753.50 in attorneys' fees. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/12/12.(LAD)
March 9, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING defendants' motion to strike 71 and 74 ; GRANTING defendants' motion for summary judgment 57 . The Clerk shall enter judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/8/12.(TLJ)
December 21, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 59 Stipulation of Dismissal: The parties having stipulated, IT IS ORDERED DISMISSING GMAC Mortgage and Homecomings Financial's counterclaims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/20/11. (LAD)
November 16, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion to amend the scheduling order (doc. 46). IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint (doc. 47). IT IS ORDERED DENYING defendants' cross-motion for entry of final judgment(doc. 51). In light of the failure to include Homecomings Financial in the proposed second amended complaint, the parties may wish to stipulate to the dismissal of Homecomings Financial under Rule 41(a), Fed. R. Civ. P. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/16/11.(LAD)
September 14, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED GRANTING defendants' motion to dismiss claims one, two, four, five, and six (doc. 33). (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/13/11.(LAD)
June 7, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/7/2011.(KAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Home Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial LLC
Represented By: Samuel Lee Lofland
Represented By: Kara Anne Ricupero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BankUnited Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Kara Anne Ricupero
Represented By: Samuel Lee Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wilson
Represented By: Timothy Steven Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?