Bean v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al

Plaintiff: Cecilia M Bean
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Unknown Parties and BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Case Number: 2:2011cv00553
Filed: March 24, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER that Ms. Gayle Miller's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 52 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant and its appointed Trustee are enjoined for a period of fourteen (14) days from the d ate and time of the issuance of this Order from conducting or pursuing in any way a trustee's sale of Plaintiff's property located at 2311 W. Hunter Court., Phoenix, Arizona 85085. FURTHER ORDERED setting a preliminary injunction hearing fo r Friday, September 27, 2013 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 850032151. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is binding on Defendant; Defendant's officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys; and any person acting in concert or participation with anyone previously described and having actual notice hereof. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Miller shall, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c), post a non-recoverable bond of $2,000.00 per month, the reasonable equivalent of property rental, as security for this Temporary Restraining Order to be paid into a trust account administered by Defendant's counsel. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/17/2013. (KMG)
January 20, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 25 ) is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/20/2012.(KMG)
January 3, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc is dismissed was a party to this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/12.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bean v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia M Bean
Represented By: R Harvey Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?