Smith v. Valley Radiologists Limited

Plaintiff: Mona C Smith
Defendant: Valley Radiologists Limited
Case Number: 2:2011cv00599
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 Memorandum filed by Mona C Smith, 77 Memorandum filed by Valley Radiologists Limited.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/10/2013. (NVO)
August 9, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/2012.(NVO)
May 25, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before 6/3/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/25/2011.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Valley Radiologists Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona C Smith
Represented By: Edmundo Pedro Robaina
Represented By: Thomas Timothy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Radiologists Limited
Represented By: Margaret F Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?