Vaile v. National Credit Works Incorporated

Plaintiff: Jessica Vaile
Defendant: National Credit Works Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv00674
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 26 . Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant is GRANTED. That the Clerk shall enter Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Jessica Vaile and against Defendant National Credit Works, In c. in the amount of $7,635 ($1,000 + $6,635 for attorney's fees, costs and non-taxable expenses). The Judgment shall earn interest at the annual federal rate from the date of entry of this Judgment until paid in full. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/30/12. (LFIG)
January 23, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing. The default damages evidentiary hearing set for 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 23, 2012 is hereby VACATED. The Court will take Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Default Judgment and Atto rney's Fees and Costs against Defendant National Credit Works, Inc., under advisement pending receipt of the documents set forth in this order, and thereafter will prepare and file a Report and Recommendation pursuant to General Order 11-3 as the Court's calendar permits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/23/12. (see order for full details)(DMT)
October 18, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the entry of default against Defendant 12 is hereby VACATED and set aside; Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default 11 , is DENIED without prejudice; and Plaintiff has until 12/19/11 in which to either properly serve Defendant or file a waiver of service, or this case will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/17/11. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaile v. National Credit Works Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Works Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Vaile
Represented By: David James McGlothlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?