Quantum Information Specialists et al v. United State of America et al

Plaintiff: James L McNully, Gilbert F R Rau, Quantum Information Specialists and Leonard J Pearlstein
Defendant: Executive Branch Government, United States Department of Defense, Unknown Parties and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00677
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction FURTHER ORDERED granting 47 Motion to Seal FURTHER ORDERED Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/9/12. (MAP)
December 19, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' third amended complaint (Doc. 30) is construed as the active complaint, and Defendant is directed to file a response or other appropriate motions by January 13, 2012. The motion to remove Quantum as a plaintiff (Doc. 28) is g ranted. The Clerk shall remove Quantum as a party to this matter. The motion for oral argument (Doc. 29) is denied. The motion requesting the status of the case (Doc. 31) has been granted by entry of this order. (See document for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/19/11.(LAD)
October 5, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as set forth above. The second amended complaint (Doc. 19) is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Quantum shall not file an amended complaint without representation by a licensed attorney. Plaintiffs shall have one additional opportunity to file an amended complaint on or before October 31, 2011. (See document for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/4/11.(LAD)
July 14, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Status of Case. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/11.(LAD)
July 12, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to dismiss (Doc. 11) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. The amended complaint (Doc. 4) is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall have until July 22, 2011 to file, consistent with this order, a second amended complaint. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiffs fail to meet this deadline. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/12/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quantum Information Specialists et al v. United State of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Branch Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L McNully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert F R Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Information Specialists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard J Pearlstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?