Castillo v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Christopher F Castillo
Defendant: Unknown Webster
Case Number: 2:2011cv00712
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the reference of this matter to Magistrate Judge Metcalf as to the settlement conference only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED referring this matter to Magistrate Judge John A. Buttrick for purposes of conducting a settlement conference as previously ordered. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/28/2013. (KMG)
June 3, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 156 that a settlement conference shall be held before United States Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/3/2013.(KMG)
July 5, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 58). State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 58 ) is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/4/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher F Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?