Smith v. Sperling et al

Plaintiff: Darlene Smith
Defendant: William J Pepicello, Unknown Parties, Brian L Swartz, Brian Mueller, P Robert Moya, Robert W Wrubel, Manuel F Rivelo, George Zimmer, Joseph L D'Amico, Gregory J Iverson, Charles B Edelstein, Gregory W Cappelli, Terri C Bishop, Dino J Deconcini, Samuel A DiPiazza, Jr., Stephen J Giusto, Roy A Herberger, Jr., Ann Kirschner, K Sue Redman, Apollo Group Incorporated, James R Reis, John G Sperling and Peter V Sperling
Case Number: 2:2011cv00722
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 71 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Nominal Defendant Apollo Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Derivative Complaint (Doc. 74 ) is granted. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend and shall file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended Complaint within thirty days, the Clerk of the Court, must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal in this action. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/25/2012. (KMG)
May 16, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a supplement to her Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Derivative Complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. Such supplement shall solely address the standing issue discussed herein and shall not exceed 5 pages. Nominal Defendant Apollo Group, Inc. may file a Response to the Supplement within 5 days of the filing of such supplement. Such Response shall not exceed 5 pages. No reply will be allowed. If Plaintiff fails to file a supplement within 10 days of the date of this Order, the Motions to Dismiss pending before this Court will be granted without further warning. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/16/2012. (KMG)
January 11, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Nominal Defendant Apollo Group, Inc.'s Motion to Stay (Doc. 49 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: Apollo's request to stay Apollo III until Apollo II is resolved is denied without prejudice. Apollo's reques t to stay Apollo III pending the Special Committee's Investigation is denied without prejudice. Apollo's request to stay Apollo III until motions to dismiss are resolved is granted. Pursuant to this Court's Order of September 28, 2011 (Doc. 65 ), Defendants shall file an answer or any other responsive motion to the Complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. Judge Rosenblatt's Order Setting Scheduling Conference of April 20, 2011 (Doc. 6) is vacated, to be reissued by this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. 53 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/10/2012. (KMG)
September 14, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Doc. 82 in CV 10-1735- PHX-JAT; Doc. 15 in CV 11-722-PHX-PGR) is granted; all future filings relating to CV 11-722 shall be filed in CV 11-722-PHX-JAT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in CV 10-1735-PHX-JAT. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 09/14/11. (ESL)
July 26, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 47 Stipulations re Briefing Schedule: Defendants' motion to stay due 7/28/2011;Plaintiff's opposition due 9/13/2011; Defendants' reply due 10/13/2011. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/26/2011. ( see order details)(TCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Sperling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Pepicello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian L Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Robert Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Wrubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel F Rivelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W Cappelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri C Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino J Deconcini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A DiPiazza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Giusto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy A Herberger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Sue Redman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter V Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Smith
Represented By: Francis A Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Albert Y Chang
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?