Le v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Hai Van Le
Defendant: Hugh Matson, Charles L Ryan, Herb Hailey and Arizona Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2011cv00744
Filed: April 14, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept no further filings in this case except in connection with an appeal. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/21/13.(TLJ)
September 12, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 84 is granted, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 76 is stricken, and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file his Cross-motion 85 is denied. P laintiff's Motion for Extention of time to Respond to the Court's Rand notice 80 is granted. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 72 is granted. The action is terminated, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/8/13.(TLJ)
June 17, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Defendants' Motion for a Notice. ORDER that Plaintiff may file a supplemental response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 72 no later than 15 days from the date of entry of this Order. Defendants may file a reply within 15 days after service of Plaintiff's supplemental response. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/14/13.(TLJ)
May 17, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' second summary judgment motion shall be filed and served no later than 15 days from the date of entry of this order; granting 69 Motion to Continue t o the extent he is seeking a continuance of the time in which to file a proposed Joint Final Pre-trial Order and denied in all other respects (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/17/13.(TLJ)
April 11, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn and the parties shall lodge a Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order by no later than 4 weeks from the filing date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/10/13. (TLJ)
November 29, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 59.). Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 59 is granted as to Osborn and denied in all other respects. The remaining claim is for a failure to protect against Ryan, Haley, Matson, and Smith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/28/12.(DMT)
August 26, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Count II is dismissed without prejudice (Doc. 8.). Defendants Ryan, Hailey, Matson, Osborn, and Smith must answer Count I of the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 8.). The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet incl uding the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 8), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Ryan, Hailey, Matson, Osborn, and Smith. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/26/11. (DMT)
June 30, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's June 24, 2011 motion for extension of time to file a first amended complaint is denied as moot. (Doc. 6.) Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/29/11.(KMG)
June 22, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for a 30-day extension of time to file a first amended complaint is granted to the extent stated below. (Doc. 4.) Plaintiff is granted an additional 30 days in which to file a first amended complaint in compliance with the May 31, 2011 Order, doc. 3. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the extension granted herein, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/21/11. (KMG)
May 31, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/31/11. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Matson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hai Van Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?