Patton v. Phoenix School of Law LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Angela Patton
Defendant: Phoenix School of Law LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00748
Filed: April 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE re Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Phoenix School of Law LLC. (Schwartz, David)
July 11, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Strike 27 Amended Complaint filed by Angela Patton. (LSP)
July 11, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Angela Patton. (Attachments: # 1 Strike-out version of Amended Complaint). (LSP)
July 8, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike 27 Amended Complaint by Phoenix School of Law LLC. (Schwartz, David)
June 21, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 05/27/2011, before Judge G Murray Snow. Court Reporter Gary Moll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2011. (BAS)
June 20, 2011 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Phoenix School of Law LLC, filed by Angela Patton.(LSP)
June 20, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant by Angela Patton. (LSP)
June 20, 2011 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Phoenix School of Law LLC for proceedings held on 05/27/2011 before Judge Snow.. (Schwartz, David)
June 15, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena by Angela Patton. (LSP)
June 10, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Contact Information by Angela Patton. (LSP)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2012. Dispositive motions due by 2/21/2012. (See Order for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/27/2011. (KFZ)
May 27, 2011 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Plaintiff Angela Patton on her own behalf. David Schwartz for defendant. Scheduling Conference held on 5/27/2011. Deadlines discussed and entered. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Motion to Expedite the Preliminary Injunction; denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel; denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Electronic Filing and denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion/Request for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/20/11.(LSP)
May 11, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Phoenix School of Law LLC. (Walz, Erin)
May 9, 2011 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Joseph C. Roberson by Plaintiff Angela Patton. (LSP)
May 9, 2011 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Angela Patton. (LSP)
May 6, 2011 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction by Defendant Phoenix School of Law LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-14)(Schwartz, David)
May 6, 2011 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Phoenix School of Law LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Schwartz, David)
May 5, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE re Notice of Issuance of Subpoenas by Phoenix School of Law LLC. (Walz, Erin)
May 5, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Hilary Walz on behalf of Phoenix School of Law LLC (Walz, Erin)
May 4, 2011 Filing 12 *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Joint Case Management by Defendant Phoenix School of Law LLC. (Schwartz, David) *Modified on 5/4/2011 from "Report", (LSP).*
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/20/2011. (NVO)
April 19, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION/Request - Affidavit for Order to Show Cause by Angela Patton. (LSP)
April 19, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing without an Attorney by Angela Patton. (LSP)
April 19, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by Angela Patton. (LSP)
April 19, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing and MOTION to Expedite the Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Angela Patton. (LSP)
April 19, 2011 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Phoenix School of Law LLC.(Schwartz, David)
April 18, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phoenix School of Law LLC identifying Corporate Parent Infilaw Corporation, Corporate Parent Phoenix School of Law B Corp I, Corporate Parent Phoenix School of Law (AZ) Inc., Corporate Parent Sterling Capital Partners, Corporate Parent Infilaw Holding, LLC for Phoenix School of Law LLC.. (Schwartz, David)
April 15, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Phoenix School of Law LLC. (REK)
April 15, 2011 Filing 3 Miscellaneous Document: Removal Letter from USDC, District of Arizona. (REK)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-5181655. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-00748-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
April 15, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2011-050840 Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-5181655, filed by Phoenix School of Law LLC (submitted by David Schwartz). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(REK)
April 15, 2011 *****State Court record received on 4/15/2011*****SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Patton. Phoenix School of Law LLC served on 4/1/2011 via signed Acceptance of Service.*****docketed in U.S. District Court on 4/15/2011 for case management purposes.***** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Phoenix School of Law LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix School of Law LLC
Represented By: David R Schwartz
Represented By: Erin Hilary Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?