Ho v. Griego et al

Plaintiff: Steven Ho
Defendant: Benjamin Griego, Timothy Dobson, Norm Carrier and Todd Thomas
Case Number: 2:2011cv00904
Filed: May 5, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must not file any further documents in this closed case. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/12/11.(MAP)
September 1, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Make Copies of New Documents (Doc. 27) is denied. (2) Plaintiff's Motion to Request Information from Judge Snow (Doc. 26) is denied. (3) Plaintiff's Motions Under R ule 56(f) to Obtain Declarations (Docs. 30, 31, and 32) are denied. (4) Plaintiff's Motion to Apply Rule 59(e) and Rule 56(f) (Doc. 33) is denied.(5) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Doc. 35) isdenied. (6) Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 36) is denied. (7) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 43) isdenied. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/1/11.(LAD)
August 4, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Defendant Provide Plaintiff with More Paper (Doc. 13) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion to Move Forward with Case 16 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion to Speed up Process 17 is deni ed as moot. Plaintiff's Motion to Disregard Previous Motion Requesting More Time to Complete Legal Documents 18 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 21 is denied. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 23 is denied as moot. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/4/11.(DMT)
July 6, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline ; denying 9 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline ; denying as moot 11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 10) and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S .C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/6/11.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ho v. Griego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Griego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norm Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?