Tindle v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Wanda Tindle
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2011cv00907
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 32 Request for Reconsideration of Order is GRANTED. The Court's 29 Order is vacated in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for an award of attorney's fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/30/2012.(LFIG)
August 24, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that attorney Rodney O. Salmi is sanctioned. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to provide a copy of this Order to the Attorney Admissions Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/24/2012. (See attached PDF for complete details.)(LFIG)
July 19, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Attorney's Fees is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/18/2012. (LFIG)
May 21, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and this case is REMANDED to the ALJ for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security, and terminate this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/21/12. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tindle v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Tindle
Represented By: Rodney Oliver Salmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Douglas A Fletcher
Represented By: Michael A Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?