Biscoe v. Garcia et al

Plaintiff: Donna Marie Biscoe
Defendant: Unknown Robles, Unknown Garcia, Unknown Butticci and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2011cv00943
Filed: May 11, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Defendants Garcia, Robles, Butticci and Lunnie must answer Count One. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the. Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 45), this Order, and both summons and request for waiv er forms for Defendants Garcia, Robles, Butticci and Lunnie. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. Defendants Garcia, Robles, Butticci and Lunnie must answer th e Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendants Ruiz, Davis and Bee will be dismissed without prejudice. This matter is ref erred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings asauthorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/13/2012. (KMG)
August 6, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery, doc. 41 , is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/6/2012.(KMG)
July 23, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, doc. 40 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a "clean" Second Amended Complaint that mirrors identically what she filed in doc.40 without any underli ning, brackets or lines through stricken language within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. No additional information may be added. Once the Court has received the Second Amended Complaint, the Court shall screen the Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/23/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biscoe v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Butticci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Marie Biscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?