McCollum v. UPS Ground Freight Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie McCollum
Defendant: Wilmer Santos-Maldanado, Unknown Parties, UPS Ground Freight Incorporated and Alfredo Duenas
Case Number: 2:2011cv00961
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 157 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/18/2013.(NVO)
January 16, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Motion for Directed Verdict re punitive damages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/16/2013.(NVO)
January 11, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/11/2013.(NVO)
January 9, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 122 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/2013.(NVO)
September 17, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/17/2012.(NVO)
August 30, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/30/2012.(NVO)
April 4, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCollum v. UPS Ground Freight Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmer Santos-Maldanado
Represented By: Phillip H Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Incorporated
Represented By: Phillip H Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J ONeill
Represented By: Lindsay S Kim Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Duenas
Represented By: Lindsay S Kim Chung
Represented By: Michael J ONeill
Represented By: Phillip H Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie McCollum
Represented By: Kelly James McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?