American Traffic Solutions Incorporated v. Lenza et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: American Traffic Solutions Incorporated
Defendant: Michael J Lenza, Public Finance Strategies LLC and Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00985
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Filing 28 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGMENT that this Order adjudicates all of the claims, rights, and liabilities of the parties in this action regarding all the claims in Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendants' Counterclaim and terminates this action, with each party to bear his or its own costs and attorneys' fees re stipulation 27 (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/6/11. (TLJ)
September 2, 2011 Filing 27 STIPULATION For Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment by American Traffic Solutions Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blanchard, John)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Notice of Settlement: IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying all pending motions as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Preliminary Injunction hearing set on September 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/5/11. (MAW)
August 4, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement by Michael J Lenza, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Public Finance Strategies LLC (Pursell, Jimmie)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Stipulation. Defendants shall file their Response to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction 4 on or before August 5, 2011. 2.Plaintiff shall file its Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction on or before August 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/1/11. (MAW)
July 28, 2011 Filing 23 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction by Michael J Lenza, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Public Finance Strategies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pursell, Jimmie)
July 25, 2011 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Public Finance Strategies LLC. (Pursell, Jimmie)
July 25, 2011 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC. (Pursell, Jimmie)
July 19, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE TO PARTY Public Finance Strategies LLC and Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Public Finance Strategies LLC and Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC. (MAW)
July 15, 2011 Filing 19 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against American Traffic Solutions Incorporated by Public Finance Strategies LLC, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Michael J Lenza.(Pursell, Jimmie)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendants may have up and until July 15, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/5/11. (MAW)
June 30, 2011 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Second Request) by Michael J Lenza, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Public Finance Strategies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pursell, Jimmie)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendants may have up and until July 1, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/11. (MAW)
June 17, 2011 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Michael J Lenza, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Public Finance Strategies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pursell, Jimmie)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION that Defendants shall file their Response on or before 7/29/11; Plaintiff shall file its Reply on or before 8/12/11 re granting 13 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/9/11. (TLJ)
June 9, 2011 Filing 13 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction by Michael J Lenza, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Public Finance Strategies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pursell, Jimmie)
June 2, 2011 Filing 12 *NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmie W Pursell, Jr and Kerry A Hodges on behalf of Michael J Lenza, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Public Finance Strategies LLC (Pursell, Jimmie) *Modified to add Kerry A Hodges on 6/2/2011 (TLJ).*
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that a hearing on Thursday, September 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (1day)will be held on Plaintiffs application for a preliminary injunction. FURTHER ORDERED vacating the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Accelerated Discovery set on June 6, 2011. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiffs Motion for Accelerated Discovery (Doc. 5).Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/2/2011.(TCA)
June 1, 2011 Filing 10 STIPULATION Re Hearing Date and Expedited Discovery by American Traffic Solutions Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blanchard, John)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Accelerated Discovery for Monday, June 6, 2011 at 4:30 p.m. FURTHER ORDERED that at the June 6, 2011 hearing the Court will discuss with counsel a date to set Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/31/2011. (TCA)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual re Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Accelerated Discovery 4 and 5 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/23/11. (TLJ)
May 18, 2011 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Michael J Lenza, Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC, Public Finance Strategies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 18, 2011 Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-5328764. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-00985-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
May 18, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by American Traffic Solutions Incorporated (submitted by John Blanchard). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(REK)
May 18, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Hearing on Motion by American Traffic Solutions Incorporated (submitted by John Blanchard). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(REK)
May 18, 2011 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Traffic Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Goldman Sachs Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent ATS Consolidated Incorporated, Corporate Parent ATS Holdings LLP for American Traffic Solutions Incorporated (submitted by John Blanchard). (REK)
May 18, 2011 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by American Traffic Solutions Incorporated (submitted by John Blanchard). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK)
May 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-5328764, filed by American Traffic Solutions Incorporated (submitted by John Blanchard). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Traffic Solutions Incorporated v. Lenza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Traffic Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: John Laxson Blanchard
Represented By: Scott William Rodgers
Represented By: Kristin Louise Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Lenza
Represented By: Kerry A Hodges
Represented By: Jimmie W Pursell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Finance Strategies LLC
Represented By: Kerry A Hodges
Represented By: Jimmie W Pursell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Photo Enforcement Consultants LLC
Represented By: Kerry A Hodges
Represented By: Jimmie W Pursell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?