Virata v. Zemke et al

Plaintiff: Luis Virata
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Eric Zemke, Worldwide Air Medical Transport, Archangel Air Ambulance, Trauma Flight Incorporated, Trauma Flight 2 Incorporated, Revenue Enhancement Specialists LLC, Steve Wallace, ACLS Pegasus LLC and Michael J Helenic, III
Case Number: 2:2011cv00988
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT that Default judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Luis Virata and against Steven Wallace as to Counts 2, 3, 5, 6, and 7. Plaintiff Luis Virata shall recover from Defendant Wallace all damages, attorneys' fees and costs s et forth in this order in the total amount of $349,590.14: $127,500 in the actual amount that Mr. Virata provided to Defendant Wallace; $82,290 in attorney's fees; $12,300.14 in legal costs; and $127,500 in punitive damages. Interest shall accrue at the rate provided in 28 U.S.C § 1961 per month from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/28/12. (LSP)
October 4, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Strike 42 Answer to Crossclaim, see PDF document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/4/11.(LSP)
August 10, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/10/2011.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virata v. Zemke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Zemke
Represented By: Kenneth B Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Air Medical Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archangel Air Ambulance
Represented By: Kenneth B Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trauma Flight Incorporated
Represented By: Kenneth B Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trauma Flight 2 Incorporated
Represented By: Kenneth B Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revenue Enhancement Specialists LLC
Represented By: Kenneth B Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wallace
Represented By: Michael William Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Seth Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACLS Pegasus LLC
Represented By: Michael William Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Seth Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Helenic, III
Represented By: Kenneth B Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Virata
Represented By: Lewis David Russell
Represented By: Kenneth K Lee
Represented By: John Gary Kerkorian
Represented By: Craig Carson Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?