Covell v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Frederick W Covell
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2011cv00992
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 51 . Petitioner Frederick W. Covell's second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (Doc. 36 ) is denied. A certificate of appealability is denied because Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/15/13. (LAD)
December 21, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 Petitioner's request for additional time to file an objection is granted. Petitioner shall file his objection on or before January 18, 2013. Petitioner's request for appointment of counsel is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/21/2012. (KMG)
October 5, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 33 Amended § 2254 Petition is dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend. Petitioner has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended petition. The Clerk of Court must enter a judgmen t of dismissal without prejudice of this action, without further notice to Petitioner, if Petitioner fails to submit a second amended petition on the court-approved form within 30 days from the filing date of this Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/4/11. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covell v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick W Covell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?