Snow v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Larry Charles Snow, Jr.
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2011cv01023
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Magistrate Judge Burns' Report and Recommendation (Doc. 16 ) is accepted. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Motion for Cer tificate of Appealability (Doc. 22 ) is denied. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/5/2012. (KMG)
December 2, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Reset Case Schedule. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/2/2011.(KMG)
October 28, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, RECOMMENDING that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 1 be DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.That a Certificate of Appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal be DENIED because the dismissal of the Petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/28/11. (DMT)
July 11, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn solely as to Petitioner's motion to correct, doc. 8. Petitioner's motion to correct record is denied. (Doc. 8.) Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/11/11.(KMG)
June 8, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. (Doc. 2.) The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition and supporting memorandum (Doc. 1 and 3) and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the Stat e of Arizona by certified mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/8/11. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Charles Snow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?