Krieger v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Kory Dean Krieger
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv01059
Filed: May 26, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Sealed Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/9/12.(MAP)
May 8, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/7/12.(DMT)
April 12, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 67 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration - that Defendant shall file a response to the motion for reconsideration on or before April 20, 2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/12/12. (DMT)
March 27, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Nationwide's motion for summary judgment 30 is granted on the breach of fiduciary duty and the SPD claims, and the benefits and preliminary injunction claims are dismissed as moot. Plaintiff's motion to strike 49 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 47 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint 50 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/26/12.(DMT)
August 25, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court will set a case management conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/2011.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krieger v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Gregory Biddle
Represented By: Kristy Leah Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory Dean Krieger
Represented By: Carl Robert Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?