Faulkner v. Bank of New York Mellon et al

Plaintiff: Valerie Faulkner and Jeremy Faulkner
Defendant: Guy P Wolf, Bridgeport Financial Services, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 2:2011cv01070
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Moving Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 11) is granted as stated above. Moving Defendants' motion for summary disposition (Doc. 13) is denied as moot. The Clerk shall terminate all defendants except Quality Loan Service Corporation , which has not appeared in this case. By October 26, 2011, Plaintiffs shall file proof of service on QLS. The Clerk shall terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiffs fail to comply.Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/2011.(KMG)
August 15, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiffs shall file a Response to Defendants' 11 MOTION to Dismiss on or before 8/19/11. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/12/11. (REW)
July 5, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Plaintiffs' 8 Petition for Injunctive Relief as stated in this Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/1/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner v. Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy P Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgeport Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?