AFL Telecommunications LLC v. Fiberoptic Hardware LLC et al

Plaintiff: AFL Telecommunications LLC
Defendant: George Kyrias and Fiberoptic Hardware LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01081
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/3/2012.(NVO)
May 31, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Plaintiff's motion for default judgment. Default judgment will be entered in favor of Plaintiff AFL Telecommunications LLC and against Defendant Fiberoptic Hardware, LLC in the amount of $217,341. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and request for leave to file an amended complaint [62, at 8] are denied. Default judgment will be entered in favor of Plaintiff on Defendant's counterclaims 54 . The Court will enter judgment in a separate order. Plaintiff may file a motion for attorneys' fees and costs on or before 6/8/12. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/31/12.(TLJ)
December 1, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Defendant/Counterclaimant shall file an amended second counterclaim on or before 12/16/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/2011.(NVO)
November 18, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Reconsideration. Preliminary injunction 34 is modified as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/2011.(NVO)
September 20, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; granting 24 Motion to transfer related case; finding as moot 26 Motion to stay decision (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/20/2011.(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFL Telecommunications LLC v. Fiberoptic Hardware LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kyrias
Represented By: Keith Clark Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiberoptic Hardware LLC
Represented By: Keith Clark Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFL Telecommunications LLC
Represented By: Shane Eric Olafson
Represented By: Sean David Garrison
Represented By: Joel T Beres
Represented By: John W Scruton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?