Woods v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Lamont Woods
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, G Gene, Bruce J McMorran and Dennis G Chenail
Case Number: 2:2011cv01085
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 14 and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal fo r failure to state a claim may count as a strike under 28:1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/21/11. (TLJ)
September 9, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The First Amended Complaint (Doc. 12) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (See document for details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/9/11. (LAD)
July 28, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Christopher L Woods. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/28/11. (TLJ)
June 16, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In For ma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/15/11.(TLJ)
June 3, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In For ma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/3/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lamont Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Gene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce J McMorran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis G Chenail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?