AFL Telecommunications LLC v. SurplusEQ.com Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: AFL Telecommunications LLC
Defendant: Unknown Parsons, SurplusEQ.com Incorporated, Tech Sales LLC and Daniel Parsons
Case Number: 2:2011cv01086
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 215 Motion in Limine; denying 216 Motion in Limine; denying 217 Motion in Limine; denying 218 Motion in Limine; denying 219 Motion in Limine; granting 220 Motion in Limine; denying 221 Motion in Limine; denying [222 ] Motion in Limine; granting 223 Motion in Limine; denying 224 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 225 Motion in Limine; denying 226 Motion in Limine; denying 227 Motion in Limine; denying 228 Motion in Limine; g ranting in part and denying in part 229 Motion in Limine; denying 230 Motion in Limine. Trial shall begin on 12/2/2013 at 9:00 a.m.; final conference set for 11/26/2013 at 4:30 PM. The parties shall hold a settlement conference by 9/30/2013.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/25/2013.(DGC, nvo)
May 20, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 147 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment FURTHER ORDERED granting 158 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to AFL's copyright infringement claim and false advertising claim as it pertains to the blog pos t, and is otherwise denied FURTHER ORDERED granting 155 with respect to the material relating to AFL's efforts to combat gray market sales (Doc. 152-1 at 26-36, 55-57) and denied with respect AFL's damages expert report (Doc. 153-1) FUR THER ORDERED The Clerk shall file the material relating to AFL's efforts to combat gray market sales (Doc. 152-1 at 26-36 and 55-57) under seal and shall accept for filing the remainder of the document lodged as Doc. 152 on the docket. The C lerk shall accept for filing Doc. 151 with all attachments, Doc. 153 with all attachments; Doc. 154 with all attachments; Doc. 169 with all attachments; Doc. 185 with all attachments FURTHER ORDERED denying 190 Motion to exclude AFL's expert opinions FURTHER ORDERED The Court shall set a Final Pretrial Conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/20/13. (MAP)
July 5, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/5/2012.(NVO)
April 26, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion for issuance of commission for foreign depositions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/2012.(NVO)
April 9, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/9/2012.(NVO)
November 15, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/15/2011.(NVO)
September 20, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (originally filed in CV-11-1081-PHX-DGC this date) - Plaintiff's motion to transfer related case (Doc. 24) is granted. The Clerk, pursuant to Local Rule 42.1(a), is directed to transfer to the undersigned Case No. CV-11-01086-FJM. (See document for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/20/11. (ALS)
September 14, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff'sclaim of common law unfair competition (doc. 25). IT IS ORDERED DENYING defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's federal unfair competition, federal f alse advertising, and copyright infringement claims (doc. 25). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING defendants' motion to stay pending transfer as moot (doc. 31).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion for preliminaryinjunction (doc. 6). (See document for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/13/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFL Telecommunications LLC v. SurplusEQ.com Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SurplusEQ.com Incorporated
Represented By: Barry Harris Uhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tech Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Parsons
Represented By: Barry Harris Uhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFL Telecommunications LLC
Represented By: Shane Eric Olafson
Represented By: Sean David Garrison
Represented By: Joel T Beres
Represented By: John W Scruton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?