Oraha v. Metrocities Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Andy B Oraha
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Unknown Parties and Metrocities Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01113
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, and Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 46 ) is granted in the amount of $26,405.90. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/29/2013.(KMG)
January 10, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: the Motion to Dismiss of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for the Morgan Stanley Loan Trust 2007-1XS (Doc. 9 ) and Mortgage Electronic System's ("MERS") Joinder in that Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Prospect Mortgage's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 16 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Prospect Mortgage's Motion for Summary Disposition (Doc. 27 ) is denied as moot. FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Moti on to Amend/Renewed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 23 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motions to Dismiss is denied as moot.Plaintiff may file an amended complain t no later than 21 days from the date of this Order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within 21 days, then the Clerk of the Court shall, without further Court order, dismiss this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/10/2012.(KMG)
September 8, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 12) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 9 and 16) within 14 days of this Order. If Plaintiff does not file a response within 14 days of this Order, then the Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this action with prejudice, without further order of the Court, for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Court's orders. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/7/2011. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oraha v. Metrocities Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Sornsin
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Sornsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Sornsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrocities Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy B Oraha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?