Flury v. CSC Credit Services et al

Plaintiff: Van E Flury
Defendant: CSC Credit Services
Case Number: 2:2011cv01166
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding DSC fees and costs in the amount of $11,769.85. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/1/12.(LAD)
December 20, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Because a response to the memorandum is allowed under LRCiv 54.2(b)(3), IT IS ORDERED GRANTING plaintiff's motion to file a supplemental response (doc. 29). Any response shall be filed no later than December 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/20/11.(LAD)
September 29, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion file Amended Complaint; denying 21 Motion to Strike; granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal. Having dismissed the only two defendants, denied the motion to amend, and no reasonable basis for amendment appearing, this action is concluded. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/29/11. (See attached PDF for complete information.)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flury v. CSC Credit Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van E Flury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSC Credit Services
Represented By: James W Bristow
Represented By: Brett L Dunkelman
Represented By: Chad M Pinson
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?