Reza v. Pearce et al

Plaintiff: Salvador Reza
Defendant: Russell Pearce, Jeff Trapp and John Burton
Case Number: 2:2011cv01170
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court has before it the mandate of the court of appeals remanding the case for trial against the defendant Pearce only 105 . The Scheduling Order 32 is amended as follows: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/12/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2016 at 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/6/2016. (LMR)
January 22, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Burton's 101 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/18/13.(REW)
December 28, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Pearce's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/2712.(LAD)
July 31, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 78 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff is prohibited from deposing defendant concerning his relationship with JT Ready. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/30/2012.(LFIG)
April 23, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 defendant Pearce's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/23/2012.(KAR)
December 2, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Motion for Entry of Judgment. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/1/11.(LAD)
October 21, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Trapp's 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting Burton's 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/20/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reza v. Pearce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Reza
Represented By: Augustine B Jimenez, III
Represented By: Stephen G Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Trapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?