Gould et al v. M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank

Plaintiff: Michael Gould and Lisa Funk
Defendant: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank
Case Number: 2:2011cv01299
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with prejudice 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/12/12.(DMT)
November 18, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint with respect to the fraud counts on or before 11/30/2011. The Court concludes that the breach of contract and bad faith claims cannot be cured by amendment. Leave to amend them therefore is denied. This is the last opportunity the Court will afford Plaintiffs to amend the complaint. All terms of the Case Management Order 23 remain in effect. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/2011.(NVO)
August 9, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/2011.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould et al v. M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gould
Represented By: Kevin Fallon McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Funk
Represented By: Kevin Fallon McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank
Represented By: Laura Nelson Hale
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?