Brogdon v. Phoenix Police Department et al

Plaintiff: George Albert Brogdon, Jr.
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department, Eric Boardman and Mylen Lubker
Case Number: 2:2011cv01389
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 74 Notice of Settlement having been filed, ORDERED vacating jury trial set for 11/12/2013 at 9:00 A.M. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot without prejudice. All pending deadlines are vacated. FURTHER ORDERED setting Status Conference for 11/26/2013 at 10:15 A.M., to be vacated upon the filing of the Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/4/2013. (TLB)
June 19, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/19/2013.(TLB)
April 26, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: (1) the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn; and (2) the parties shall lodge a Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order in accordance herewith by no later than July 11, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/26/13. (LAD)
April 11, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn re 51 . Granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. The City of Phoenix is dismssed as a Defendant (see attached order for complete information). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/11/13.(TLJ)
April 23, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants Lubker's and Boardman's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 19). Defendants Lubker's and Boardman's Motion to Dismiss 19 is denied as moot. Count III of the First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Defendants Boardman, Lubker, and the City of Phoenix must answer Counts I and II of the First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet includin g the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 14), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant City of Phoenix. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/23/12.(DMT)
September 7, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of George Albert Brogdon, Jr. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/7/11. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brogdon v. Phoenix Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Albert Brogdon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylen Lubker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?