Baker v. Attorney General of the State of Arizona et al

Plaintiff: John Allen Baker
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department, Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Peter Eicker and Unknown Philips
Case Number: 2:2011cv01411
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff must respond to this Order to Show Cause within 20 days as detailed herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order to Show Cause the Clerk of Court must dismiss this action without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/5/12. (LAD)
March 19, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Count III is dismissed. The remaining claim is Count I. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 03/16/12. (ESL)
October 4, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn solely as to Plaintiff's motion for extension of time and clarification Doc. 8 . Plaintiff's motion for extension of time and clarification is granted to the extent stated herein. (Doc. 8.) The Order filed on September 15, 2011 is amended to the extent that the date of August 11, 2011 on page 3 is amended to August 11, 2010. (Doc. 6.) The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a new service packet including the Firs t Amended Complaint (Doc. 5), the Order filed on September 15, 2011, doc. 6, and this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Philips. Plaintiff must complete and return the new service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/4/2011. (KMG)
September 15, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of John Allen Baker. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 09/14/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Attorney General of the State of Arizona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Eicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Philips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Allen Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?