Russell v. OneWest Bank FSB et al

Plaintiff: Thomas E Russell
Defendant: OneWest Bank FSB, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending Incorporated, Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation, Shapiro, Van Ess & Sherman LLP and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv01463
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendants' motion for an award of attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,000.00. (Doc. 40 ). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/21/2012.(KMG)
April 30, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 plaintiff's motion for order restraining sale. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/27/2012.(KAR)
March 9, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Fairway's unopposed motion to set aside entry of default (doc. 45 ). FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Fairway's motion to dismiss (doc. 47 ) as premature, without prejudice to filing a new motion to dismiss on the merits. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/9/2012.(KMG)
November 15, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/15/2011.(KAR)
October 20, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiff's motion to remand doc. 15 . IT IS ORDERED GRANTING Shapiro's motion to dismiss doc. 26 . FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING defendants' motion to dismiss counts three through six of the first amended complaint again st defendants OneWest, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for IndyMac INDX Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-AR31, and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc. Doc. 16 . This leaves counts one and two against defendant Fairway as the only remaining claims. IT IS ORDERED DENYING defendants' first motion to dismiss doc. 11 as moot. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/20/2011.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. OneWest Bank FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank FSB
Represented By: John Maston O'Neal
Represented By: Michael Shawn Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Michael Shawn Catlett
Represented By: John Maston O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Shawn Catlett
Represented By: John Maston O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro, Van Ess & Sherman LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Russell
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?