Raw Films Limited v. Unknown Party et al

Plaintiff: Raw Films Limited
Defendant: Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2011cv01603
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Jay Roth's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment (Doc. 50 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Default Judgment entered against Jay Roth on June 22, 2012 (Doc. 46 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Jay Roth shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/2/2012.(KMG)
June 22, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant Josip Gotvalds Motion to Set AsideClerks Entry of Default (Doc. 44).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Gotvald shall answer the Complaint orotherwise defend within 20 days from the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying in part and granting in part Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (Doc. 41). The motion is denied with respect to Mr. Gotvald. The motion is granted with respect to Defendant Jay Roth to the extent provided in the Default Judgment filed herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the Motion to Quash Supoena [sic] at Doc. 11 as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Defendant John Doe 5's Motions at Docs. 19 and 20. The Clerk shall leave Docs. 19 and 20 under seal. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/22/12.(LAD)
March 2, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motion for extension of time to serve (Doc. 30 ) is denied without prejudice to refiling by March 9, 2012, consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/2/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raw Films Limited v. Unknown Party et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raw Films Limited
Represented By: Ryan J Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?