Lewallen v. Home Depot USA Incorporated

Plaintiff: Yvonne Lewallen
Defendant: Home Depot USA Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv01639
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs and that Plaintiffs take nothing. The Clerk shall terminate this case. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/19/13. (LAD)
September 12, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Vacate Judgment is granted. That the August 3, 2012 Minute Order (Doc. 42) terminating this case is vacated. That Defendant's 43 Bill of Costs and 44 Motion for Attorneys' Fees are denied without prejudice as premature. That Defendant file a response to the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 51) by October 1, 2012. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/11/12.(DMT)
July 23, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's 34 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 31 amended complaint is dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint by 5:00 p.m., 07/30/12. If Plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint by 5:00 p.m., 07/30/12, the Clerk shall terminate this case without further notice to Plaintiff. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/23/12. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewallen v. Home Depot USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Lewallen
Represented By: Charlene Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?