Foret v. Stryker Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Allison Foret
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation and DJO LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01707
Filed: August 30, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter the Judgment of Dismissal. The Clerk shall vacate 87 Order dismissing this case. Plaintiff's counsel is sanctioned as follows: Plaintiff's counsel shall per sonally pay any fees that Defendants incurred in opposing the Motion to Alter Judgment. All dates set forth in 72 this Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Order shall remain in effect, except as follows: Any motion to amend the Complaint shall be filed no later than April 27, 2012. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/10/11.(LSP)
December 9, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, for lack of federal subjectmatter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/9/11. (LSP)
November 15, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a second supplement properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction by November 21, 2011. If this supplement does not establish jurisdiction, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice. Because the parties cannot stipulate to federal subject matter jurisdiction, Defendant must move to dismiss this case if the Court lacks jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/15/11. (DMT)
November 3, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that by November 21, 2011, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the joint proposed case management plan properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/3/2011. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foret v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Foret
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Carrie R Capouellez
Represented By: Daniel N Gallucci
Represented By: Dianne M Nast
Represented By: Joseph F Roda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation
Represented By: Donn Christopher Alexander
Represented By: Megan E Grossman
Represented By: Rebecca J Letourneaux
Represented By: Peter J Strelitz
Represented By: Walter H Swayze, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO LLC
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Raymond Paul Rogissart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?