Henry v. Universal Technical Institute et al

Plaintiff: Tami E Henry
Defendant: Mike Romano, Ken Golaszewski, Maria Walters, Harvey Davis, Heather Gonzales, Bernie Candeleria, Markia Baker, Unknown Kapusta, Unknown Parties, Karen Mourad, Mike White, Tom Riggs, Kimberly McWaters, Universal Technical Institute, Adrian Cordova and Kathy Bochenski
Case Number: 2:2011cv01773
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiff's motion for recusal (doc. 130 ) and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (doc. 119 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING defendant's motion for summary judgment (doc. 122 ) and DENYING defendant's motion to dismiss as moot (doc. 129 ).The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/9/2013.(KMG)
September 13, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiff's motion to compel (doc. 113 ). IT IS ORDERED GRANTING UTI's motion to compel (doc. 114 ). Plaintiff is ordered to appear for a deposition in Phoenix and answer questions under oath. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING UTI' ;s second motion to compel and motion for sanctions (doc. 116 ). Plaintiff shall pay UTI's reasonable costs and expenses in traveling to Texas a second time to finish Alan Henry's deposition, including travel expenses and costs for the court reporter and videographer. Discovery in this action closed on August 21, 2012. We extend the discovery deadline for the limited purpose of allowing UTI to complete the depositions of plaintiff and Alan Henry. This order shall not be construed to alter any other deadline set forth in the Rule 16 scheduling order, including the September 21, 2012 dispositive motion deadline. Plaintiff is strongly admonished that his failure to comply with this Order will result in serious sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/13/2012.(KMG)
May 9, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 92 ). All claims are dismissed except for plaintiff's Title VI claim alleging that UTI engaged in race discrimination by not allowing plaintiff to take the Induction System test in August 2010. This claim only remains against UTI. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/8/2012.(KMG)
April 5, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiff's motion for default judgment (doc. 88). We urge plaintiff to seek the advice of a lawyer. A review of the docket strongly suggests that plaintiff will not be able to navigate this litigation on his own. If he does not have a lawyer, he may wish to contact the Lawyer Referral Service of the Maricopa County Bar Association at 602-257-4434. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/5/2012.(KMG)
March 9, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 65 ). This dismissal is without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to file and serve his amended complaint on all parties in compliance with LRCiv 15.1. Otherwise the Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/8/2012. (KMG)
December 28, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 40 motion for default judgment; denying plaintiff's 48 motion for intervention; granting plaintiff's second 47 motion for leave to amend. Plaintiff shall comply with LRCiv 15.1, which requires that plai ntiff file and serve the amended complaint on all parties within fourteen days of this order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's amended complaint within ten days of being served; denying plaintiff's first 42 motion for leave to amend on grounds of mootness; denying defendants' 11 motion to dismiss on grounds of mootness. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/28/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Universal Technical Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Candeleria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markia Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kapusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Mourad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly McWaters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Technical Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Bochenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami E Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?