Clinkscale v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence V Clinkscale
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Unknown Brown, Unknown Parties, Ron Credio and Unknown Bradley
Case Number: 2:2011cv01792
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 18). Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 18 ) is granted; the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust; in the altern ative, it is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.2(i). The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The docket must reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith and Plaintiff is not entitled to in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/30/2012. (KMG)
November 10, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 6 Order: IT IS ORDERED: (1) Withdrawing the reference from the Magistrate Judge as to the portion of the October 28, 2011 Order concerning Defendants Doe I, Doe II, and Doe III, doc. 6 at 10. (2) The portion of the October 28, 2011 Order concerning Defendants Doe I, Doe II, and Doe III is vacated. (Doc. 6 at 10.) (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/10/11. (LAD)
October 28, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Lawrence V. Clinkscale. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/28/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinkscale v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Credio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence V Clinkscale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?