Enterprise Bank & Trust v. Vintage Ranch Investments LLC et al

Plaintiff: Enterprise Bank & Trust
Defendant: Vintage Ranch Investments LLC, M Laurin Hendrix and Evelyn Hendrix
Case Number: 2:2011cv01797
Filed: September 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Yellowdog Investments, LLC's 46 Motion for Relief from Judgment as to Evelyn Hendrix only is GRANTED. Defendant/Judgment Debtor Evelyn Hendrix ONLY has satisfied, and is hereby relieved from, the April 16, 2012 Judgment entered this action. On the Court's own motion, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall use the above caption in all future filings herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/9/2013.(LFIG)
June 25, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust's 44 Motion for Substitution of Non-Party is GRANTED. Plaintiff's successor in interest, Yellowdog Investments, LLC, is hereby substituted in this action and Judgment for Enterprise Bank & Trust, a Missouri chartered trust company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/25/2013.(LFIG)
April 16, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER granting 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and granting 40 Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fees and 38 Statement of Costs. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintif f Enterprise Bank & Trust and against Defendants Vintage Ranch Investment, LLC, M. Laurin Hendrix and Evelyn Hendrix in the amount of $5,230,910.74. See PDF document for details. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment consistent with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/16/12. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enterprise Bank & Trust v. Vintage Ranch Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enterprise Bank & Trust
Represented By: Stefan Mark Palys
Represented By: Jeffrey J Goulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Ranch Investments LLC
Represented By: Douglas Clark Wigley
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Laurin Hendrix
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Douglas Clark Wigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Hendrix
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Douglas Clark Wigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?