Overturf v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: George Wilson Overturf
Defendant: Unknown Party, Janice K Brewer, Terry L Goddard, Charles L Ryan, H Valenzuela, Dennis R Kendall, Unknown Romero, Unknown French, A Swindle and Unknown Chavez
Case Number: 2:2011cv01856
Filed: September 21, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/13/13. (LAD)
December 4, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Plaintiff's post-judgment motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/4/12.(LAD)
November 26, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 38 and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Plaintiff's motions are denied [39-42]. The Clerk of Court must make an entr y on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a strike under 28:1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) and the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/26/12.(TLJ)
July 17, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's 7/16/12 Motion for Extension of Time as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/17/12.(LAD)
May 9, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is construed as a motion for extension of time in which to file a second amended complaint. (Doc. 29.) (2) Plaintiff's motions for an extension of time and for leave to amend are g ranted to the extent stated below. (Doc. 29, 30.) (3) Plaintiff is granted until June 16, 2012 in which to file a second amended complaint in compliance with the February 16, 2012 Order, doc. 17. (4) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint wi thin the extension granted herein, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of thisaction with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/9/12.(LAD)
April 16, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend; denying 25 Motion to Compel; denying 26 Motion to Compel. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/16/12.(LAD)
February 16, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Doc. 16.) Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. (2) If Plaintiff f ails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 191 5(g). Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. (Doc. 15.) Pro bono counsel representing Plaintiff must file a notice of appearance no later than 30 days from the filing date of this Order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/12.(LAD)
November 28, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is granted an additional 30 days from the filing date of this Order in which to file a first amended complaint in compliance with the November 7, 2011 Order, doc . 7. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the extension granted herein, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. (Doc. 10.) (See document for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/28/11.(LAD)
November 7, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion to submit a complete in forma pauperis application and granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED denying as moot 2 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint is dimissed with 30 days leave to amend. Clerk nust enter dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/7/11.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overturf v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis R Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Swindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Wilson Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?