Muhammad v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Riki Rashaad Muhammad
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections, Charles L Ryan, Mike Linderman, Jeff Lind, Victor Rendone, Laura Donnally and Unknown Aames
Case Number: 2:2011cv01890
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Graham
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff Muhammad's "Complaint to Recover Unpaid Sum", which is docketed as a Motion 103 ; the Complaint/Motion is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/19/15.(REW)
April 23, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Ams's Motion for Summary Judgment 90 . Motion for Summary Judgment 90 is denied without prejudice. Within 10 days from the date of this Order, Defendant Ams may file a new motion for summary judgment limited to the exhaustion issue. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/23/2015.(LMR)
August 1, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Ams' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 67 , construed as a Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, and the Motion is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/31/14.(REW)
July 30, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court's order to show cause filed 7/1/14 shall be deemed satisfied; pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Partial Dismissal 71 , Counts 2, 3 and 4 of the Second Amended Complaint 25 are dismissed with prejudice; Defendants Lind, Linderman, Ryan and Krause are dismissed with prejudice; Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Relief 37 is denied as moot; Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification 46 is denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/30/14. (REW)
July 25, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Counts One, Five and Six are dismissed with prejudice; Defendants Donnally and C.O.II C. Lind are dismissed without prejudice; Defendant Arizona Deparment of Corrections is dismissed with prejudice; Defendants Ryan, Krause, Li nderman and J. Lind. must answer Count Two of the Second Amended Complaint; Defendants Linderman and J. Lind must answer Count Three of the Second Amended Complaint; Defendants Krause, Linderman and J. Lind must answer Count Four of the Second Amende d Complaint; Defendant Ams must answer Count Seven of the Second Amended Complaint; the Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint 25 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants R yan, Krause, Linderman, J. Lind and Ams; Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days; of the date this Order is filed; this matter is again referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson for further pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/25/13. (REW)
September 6, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Produce Copies and Waive or Defer Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/5/12.(DMT)
August 7, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 24 Motion to Produce Copies is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/7/2012.(LFIG)
July 17, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Plaintiff shall file a "clean" Second Amended Complaint that mirrors identically what he filed in Doc.22 without any underlining or lines through stricken language wi thin 14 days from the date of this Order; no additional information may be added; once the Court has received the Second Amended Complaint, the Court shall screen the Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/17/12. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riki Rashaad Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Linderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Rendone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Donnally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Aames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?