Iglesias v. Goodyear, City of

Plaintiff: Julio Iglesias
Defendant: Goodyear, City of
Case Number: 2:2011cv01891
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter final judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/19/13. (LAD)
October 30, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's counsel's renewed motion to withdraw 98 . Counsel may file a renewed motion to withdraw concurrently with his response to the motion for summary judgment (see order for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/29/12.(JAMA)
September 20, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 defendant's application for attorney's fees and costs. Defendant is awarded sanctions in the amount of $2,337.75. Plaintiff and his lawyer are jointly and severally liable for payment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/20/12.(TLJ)
August 24, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 defendant's partial summary judgment motion re:notice of claim defenses. ORDER granting 58 the motion for sanctions and that defendant submit an application for attorneys' fees caused by plaintiff's failure to app ear at his deposition within 10 days of the filing of this order. The application shall include a task-based itemized statement of fees and expenses. Plaintiff may file a response within 10 days of the filing of defendant's application. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 08/23/12.(JAMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iglesias v. Goodyear, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Iglesias
Represented By: Patricia Kirtley Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?