Vawter v. ReconTrust Company NA et al

Plaintiff: Julie M Vawter
Defendant: ReconTrust Company NA and Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv01916
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. This matter shall remain closed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/31/12.(LSP)
May 16, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Stop Foreclosure Sale (Doc. 15) is denied.Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 17) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/16/12.(LAD)
January 4, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. All claims in Plaintiff's existing complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Should Plaintiff desire to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint, she shall do so no later than 3 0 days from the date of this Order. The proposed amended complaint shall be attached to the motion for leave to amend and comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 15 and Local Rules of Civil Procedure 15.1. The Court will not permit the filing of any proposed amended complaint that does not comply with the requirements of this Order, or that seeks to reassert claims that have been dismissed. If Plaintiff does not file a motion requesting leave to file an amended complaint by February 3, 2012, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/4/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vawter v. ReconTrust Company NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie M Vawter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company NA
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Eskay
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Eskay
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?