Hernandez v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: Cristobal Hernandez, Jr.
Defendant: James Rimmer, Benjamin Parry, Terry L Goddard, Janice K Brewer, Thomas C Horne, Arizona, State of, Pinal, County of, James P Walsh, Pinal County Board of Supervisors, Stephen C Lepley, Katrin M Nelson, Eric J Herrmann, Barton J Fears, Matthew D Conti, Unknown Parties, Monica Goddard, Janet Gygax and Paul R Babeu
Case Number: 2:2011cv01945
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 115 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 122 Plaintiff's Motion to File Supplement; denying 127 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; granting [128 ] Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Response; denying 133 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; denying 134 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File; denying 140 Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Review Exhibits; granting 150 Defendant&# 039;s Motion to Strike and the Clerk of the Court shall strike 149 ; denying 154 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Letter; denying 161 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Exhibit; denying as moot 164 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing; denying 165 Plaintiff's Motion for to Withdraw and Leave to File. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/9/13.(TLJ)
March 15, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); granting 75 Motion for Leave to File; denying 83 Motion to Change Venue and request for sanctions; denying as moot the 89 Motion to Expedite; granting 90 Objection and Motion to Strike. The Clerk of the Court shall strike Doc. 89 from the Record. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/15/13. (LAD)
March 13, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying that part of Plaintiff's Request for Change of Venue that is a request for recusal of the Honorable James A. Teilborg, doc. 83 . Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/13/13.(SJF)
October 31, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ; denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 50 Motion to Stay; denying 51 Motion to Stay; denying 53 Motion to Amend; denying 61 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/31/12.(TLJ)
July 9, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Pinal County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 18 is granted as set forth herein. ORDER that the State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 21 is granted as set forth herein. ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Pinal County to Re turn Exhibits from Plaintiff's criminal trial 17 is denied. ORDER that Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Conference and Motion to Stay Discovery 41 is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court shall not enter judgment at this time. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/9/12.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinal, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinal County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C Lepley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrin M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton J Fears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Gygax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R Babeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristobal Hernandez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?