CSR Technology Incorporated v. Bandspeed Incorporated
Plaintiff: CSR Technology Incorporated
Defendant: Bandspeed Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv01948
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue and granting in part #26 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the Honorable Lee Yeakel in the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/5/12.(LSP)
April 5, 2012 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in Western District of Texas. New Case Number: 1:12 cv 297. (MAP)
December 23, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE re of Errata by CSR Technology Incorporated re #27 Lodged Proposed Document, #26 MOTION for Leave to File for Leave to File Surreply . (Attachments: #1 Corrected Dec and Exhibits)(Voit, William)
December 23, 2011 Filing 27 *LODGED Proposed Surreply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File for Leave to File Surreply . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion for Leave to File is granted. Filed by CSR Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration)(Voit, William) *Modified to unseal on 12/27/2011 (JHER).
December 23, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File for Leave to File Surreply by CSR Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Voit, William)
December 19, 2011 Filing 25 DECLARATION of ROBERT C. MAYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BANDSPEED INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE re #23 Reply to Response to Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR TRANSFER VENUE by Defendant Bandspeed Incorporated. (Farrell, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Filing 24 DECLARATION of MICHAEL J. FARRELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BANDSPEED INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE re #23 Reply to Response to Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR TRANSFER VENUE by Defendant Bandspeed Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrell, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR TRANSFER VENUE filed by Bandspeed Incorporated. (Farrell, Michael)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
December 7, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian AE Smith on behalf of Bandspeed Incorporated. (BAS)
December 7, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Matthew E Greinert on behalf of Bandspeed Incorporated. (BAS)
December 7, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX116600 as to Brian AE Smith. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 7, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX116599 as to Matthew F Greinert. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 1, 2011 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Amber Youngs re #18 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by CSR Technology Incorporated. (Schaffer, Robert)
December 1, 2011 Filing 18 *RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR TRANSFER VENUE filed by CSR Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-8, #3 Exhibit 8 part 2, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11-13, #7 Exhibit 14-16, #8 Exhibit 17-21)(Schaffer, Robert) *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c); attorney notified on 12/2/2011 (LSP).
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 23, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gregory T Chuebon on behalf of CSR Technology Incorporated. (BAS)
November 23, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeffrey E Danley on behalf of CSR Technology Incorporated. (BAS)
November 23, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Victor Cole on behalf of CSR Technology Incorporated. (BAS)
November 23, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Harrison J Frahn IV on behalf of CSR Technology Incorporated. (BAS)
November 23, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Patrick E King on behalf of CSR Technology Incorporated. (BAS)
November 23, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 250, receipt number PHX116155 as to Gregory T Chuebon, Jeffrey E Danley, Victor Cole, Harrison J Frahn, IV, Patrick E King. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 27, 2011 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Michael J. Farrell in Support of Defendant Bandspeed Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR TRANSFER VENUE by Defendant Bandspeed Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Farrell, Michael)
October 27, 2011 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Robert C. Mayer in Support of Defendant Bandspeed, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR TRANSFER VENUE by Defendant Bandspeed Incorporated. (Farrell, Michael)
October 27, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR TRANSFER VENUE by Bandspeed Incorporated. (Farrell, Michael)
October 27, 2011 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bandspeed Incorporated. (Farrell, Michael)
October 27, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Farrell on behalf of Bandspeed Incorporated (Farrell, Michael)
October 24, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE re Proof of Service by CSR Technology Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Schaffer, Robert)
October 5, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bandspeed Incorporated. (JRD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 5, 2011 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-5900734. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-11-1948-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JRD)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by CSR Technology Incorporated. (Sumbitted by Robert Schaffer) (JRD)
October 5, 2011 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSR Technology Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent CSR Technology Holdings Incorporated, Other Affiliate BlackRock Incorporated, Other Affiliate CSR plc, Other Affiliate Schroders PLC for CSR Technology Incorporated. (Submitted by Robert Schaffer) (JRD)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 0970-5900734, filed by CSR Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Submitted by Robert Schaffer)(JRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSR Technology Incorporated v. Bandspeed Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSR Technology Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory T Chuebon
Represented By: Victor Cole
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey E Danley
Represented By: Patrick E King
Represented By: Robert Gerald Schaffer
Represented By: William George Voit - Inactive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandspeed Incorporated
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Matthew F Greinert
Represented By: Brian AE Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?