St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of America, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company and Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, American Safety Indemnity Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Company and American Home Assurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv01954
Filed: October 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2014 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 389 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief Opposing Efforts to Vacate this Court's Order Dated 8/15/2014. Del Webb is granted 21 days to file its brief. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/8/2014.(LMR)
August 15, 2014 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Declaring that St. Paul, Charter Oak, Travelers, Zurich, MCC, AGLIC, AHAC, CIIC, LIC, LMIC, OCIC, and ASIC, all have a duty to defend Del Webb as described in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED declaring that the proportional shares of defense cos ts for St. Paul, Charter Oak, Travelers, Zurich, MCC, AGLIC, AHAC, CIIC, LIC, LMIC, OCIC, and ASIC are equal to their respective policy limits quotients as described in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court terminate the case. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/15/14. (MAP)
July 2, 2014 379 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 377 Stipulation of Dismissal : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing with prejudice CNA's crossclaims against Zurich Group, AIG, LMIC, OCIC, and ASIC, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice Zurich's and AIG's crossclaims against CNA, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. FURTHER ORDERED terminating CNA from the action as all claims, counterclaims, and crossclaims to which CNA was a party have been dismissed. (See Doc. 366). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/2/2014. (ALS)
June 25, 2014 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 371 Stipulation of Dismissal : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing without prejudice ASIC from AIG's crossclaims. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/25/2014. (ALS)
June 24, 2014 374 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 370 Stipulation : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing without prejudice ASIC from Plaintiffs' claims. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/23/2014. (ALS)
May 23, 2014 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' 363 Stipulation. ORDERED dismissing with prejudice CNA and Zurich Group from Plaintiffs' claims. ORDERED terminating Steadfast Insurance Company from this action because the only claims asserted agai nst it have been dismissed. See LRCiv 15.1(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs from Zurich's Counter-Claim; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs from CNA's Counter-Claims. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/22/2014. (LFIG)
March 28, 2014 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 264 AHAC/CIIC'sMotion for Partial Summary Judgment Against LMFIC, denying 267 LMFIC's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs' and Cross-claimants' Claims. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/28/2014.(LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Hershel Ber
Represented By: Daniel Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Eli
Represented By: Hershel Ber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Hershel Ber
Represented By: Daniel Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?