Fernandez v. Phoenix, City of et al

Plaintiff: Elvira Fernandez
Defendant: Phoenix, City of, Richard Allen Chrisman, Unknown Chrisman and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv02001
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That the clerk will UNSEAL the Stipulated Final Judgment 123 filed on April 4, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/16/14. (MAP)
March 6, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a response 110 ; denying Defendant's motion to amend his admissions 93 ; granting Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on counts 1, 2, 5 and 6 90 ; Trial on the remaining issues, including damages, is set for 4/16/13. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/5/13.(REW)
September 14, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion to exclude testimony of WilliamLewinksi (doc. 78 ). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 09/13/12.(JAMA)
June 20, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the City of Phoenix's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' § 1983 claims (doc. 31). Count four is dismissed. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the City of Phoenix's motion for judgment on the pleadings on state law claims (doc. 32). Counts five and six are dismissed against the Cityof Phoenix. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/20/12.(LAD)
June 4, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Richard Chrisman's motion for summary judgment (titled judgment on the pleadings) as to state law claims (doc. 33). The parties are reminded that pursuant to the Rule 16 scheduling order, a party "shall file no more than one motion for summary judgment unless leave of Court is obtained" (doc.13 at 3). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/1/12.(SJF)
May 29, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Chrisman's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/25/2012.(KAR)
March 7, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the parties' 20 stipulated motion for leave for plaintiff to file a first amended complaint joining claims by Frank Rodriquez. Plaintiff shall comply with the filing and service requirements of LRCiv 15.1; DENYING the City of Phoenix 9;s 10 motion to dismiss for lack of standing on grounds of mootness; DENYING the City of Phoenix's 15 motion to consolidate cases and designate a single statutory plaintiff on grounds of mootness. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 03/07/12.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen Chrisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chrisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvira Fernandez
Represented By: Sabinus A Megwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?