Grady et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Michael Grady and Jennifer Grady
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Elmwood Financial Corporation, Jonathan Levin, Unknown Parties and Sarah Levin
Counter_claimant: Tri City National Bank
Counter_defendant: Michael Grady and Jennifer Grady
Case Number: 2:2011cv02060
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2014 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/30/2014.(TLB)
August 5, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 206 is denied; the Court's Stay of the release of the Bond proceeds 203 is hereby lifted as follows: the Bond in the amount of $268,330.00 is released to Plaintiffs, Michael and Jennifer Grady (to be sent to their counsel). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/5/14.(REW)
June 30, 2014 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Tri City National Bank's Motion to Exonerate 176 is denied; Michael and Jennifer Grady's Countermotion to Exonerate the Bond 179 is granted as follows: the Bond in the amount of $268,330.00 is released to the Gradys (to be sent to their counsel). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/30/14.(REW)
March 26, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 165 Defendant Jonathan Levin's Motion for Summary Judgment, consistent with the reasoning set out in the attached Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal law statutory-based claims against Defendant related to TILA, RESPA, and ECOA in Counts VII, VIII, and X are dismissed with prejudice, consistent with this Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/26/2014.(TLB)
April 2, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 144 Motion to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall file a supplemental brief by 10:00 a.m., Wednesday, 4/3/2013 discussing items (1), (2) and (3) as set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/2/2013.(TLB)
December 20, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiffs' motion to extend time to file a response 113 is granted to the extent that the Court has considered Plaintiffs' response filed at Doc. 115; the Levin Defendants' motion to preclude damages calculation 106 is deni ed; Plaintiffs' motion to extend 115 is granted such that the deadlines are extended as follows (any deadlines not specifically referenced in this Order are not extended): The party with the burden of proof shall disclose experts by 12/31/12; The responding party shall disclose experts by 1/31/13; Rebuttal experts disclosures are due by 2/15/13; Discovery closes 3/15/13; and Dispositive motions are due by 4/19/13. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/20/12. (REW)
December 14, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the claims against TCNB listed in the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed, and TCNB is dismissed as a Defendant; the motion to strike 57 is granted as to TCNB only. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/13/12.(REW)
October 17, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiffs' motion for expedited consideration 100 is granted; Plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend orders 98 is denied; Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a third amended complaint 98 is denied; Plaintiffs' motion for Rule 54(b) certification 98 is denied. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/17/12.(REW)
August 27, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 82 Motion to Exonerate Bond; the parties shall file a status report by 11/1/12, advising whether the Trustee will be substituting in as the Plaintiff and whether the parties anticipate the claims in this case ultimately being resolved within the bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/24/12.(REW)
August 6, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 70 Emergency Second Motion for Partial Reconsideration to provide the clarification but denying all relief requested in the Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' 75 Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order with Notice and Application for Preliminary Injunction and vacating the Preliminary Injunction Hearing currently set for 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, August 8, 2012. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/6/2012. (See attached PDF for complete details.) (LFIG)
May 21, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 50 Motion for Reconsideration; granting Plaintiffs' 51 Motion for Extension of Time to the limited extent that Plaintiffs shall have 5 days from the date of this Order to file a Second Amended Complaint that co mplies with the Court's 4/4/12 Order 47 ; if Plaintiffs do not file a Second Amended Complaint within that time, the Clerk will dismiss this case without further notice for failure to obey a court order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/21/12. (REW)
April 4, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that TCNB's Motion to Dissolve (Doc. 9-1) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that TCNB's Motion to Release (Doc. 9-2) is DENIED without prejudice to re-filing at a later date. The bond will not be exonerated and will remain with the Clerk of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion (Doc. 10-2) is DENIED. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/4/12.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grady
Represented By: John R Politan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Grady
Represented By: John R Politan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey A Sandell
Represented By: Andrea H Landeen
Represented By: Gregory P Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmwood Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Levin
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Frakes
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Levin
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Tri City National Bank
Represented By: Neal Hait Bookspan
Represented By: Laura Allison Rogal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michael Grady
Represented By: John R Politan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jennifer Grady
Represented By: John R Politan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?